Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jackson, Debra Lynn, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Bert Steinmann, against Jackson, Terry Eugene, represented by Robert A Rosenquist, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2014 |
CategoryPost Judgment Action Modification Custody |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Signed Order
Date: May 18, 2020Original Answer
Date: March 05, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: February 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: January 23, 2020Order or Judgment Granting Enforcement of Prior Order
Date: October 10, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 10, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 24, 2019Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: August 26, 2019Signed Order
Date: May 13, 2019Signed Order
Date: February 08, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 13, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 02, 2018Scheduling Order
Date: October 22, 2018Proposed Order
Date: October 22, 2018Post-Judgment - Enforcement (OCA)
Date: October 11, 2018Proposed Order
Date: September 11, 2018Original Answer
Date: August 21, 2018Appeal - Mandate
Date: July 17, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: July 17, 2018Post Judgment - Modification - Other (OCA)
Date: June 25, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: April 17, 2018Appeal - Opinion
Date: March 15, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: June 05, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: May 12, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: March 31, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: March 08, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: February 07, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: January 30, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: January 18, 2017Appeal - Correspondence
Date: December 12, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: November 28, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: October 24, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: September 28, 2016Appeal - Notice of Late Record
Date: September 28, 2016Appeal - Bill of Cost
Date: September 21, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: August 25, 2016Appeal - Notice of Late Record
Date: August 24, 2016Appeal - Bill of Cost
Date: August 10, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: June 16, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: June 01, 2016Letters
Date: May 31, 2016Appeal - Notice of Appeal
Date: May 25, 2016Post Judgment - Motion for New Trial
Date: May 25, 2016Proposed Order
Date: May 25, 2016Proposed Order
Date: April 22, 2016Letters
Date: January 12, 2016Proposed Order
Date: January 11, 2016Letters
Date: January 11, 2016Letters
Date: January 08, 2016Signed Order
Date: January 08, 2016Proposed Order
Date: January 07, 2016Letters
Date: January 07, 2016Amended Petition
Date: January 07, 2016Letters
Date: January 06, 2016Signed Order
Date: December 23, 2015Signed Order
Date: December 18, 2015Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2015Signed Order
Date: December 17, 2015Letters
Date: December 16, 2015Proposed Order
Date: December 16, 2015Signed Order
Date: November 04, 2015Signed Order
Date: September 08, 2015Letters
Date: June 04, 2015Settlement Agreements
Date: March 31, 2015Signed Order
Date: March 05, 2015Signed Order
Date: February 06, 2015Docket Control Order
Date: February 02, 2015Signed Order
Date: January 14, 2015Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: December 18, 2014Proposed Order
Date: December 16, 2014Letters
Date: November 13, 2014E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: November 13, 2014Signed Order
Date: January 23, 2020Signed Order
Date: April 05, 2019Signed Order
Date: March 07, 2019Original Answer
Date: December 04, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 05, 2018Original Answer
Date: September 20, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: May 09, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: March 15, 2018Proposed Order
Date: April 09, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: February 07, 2018Appeal - Correspondence
Date: December 29, 2016Appeal - Correspondence
Date: July 12, 2016Appeal - Notice of Appeal
Date: May 31, 2016Proposed Order
Date: January 05, 2016Signed Order
Date: December 16, 2015Proposed Order
Date: August 28, 2015Order to Appoint
Date: February 06, 2015Settlement Agreements
Date: January 05, 2015Subpoena
Date: December 16, 2014Proposed Order
Date: November 13, 2014Signed Order
Date: December 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Parenting Certificate
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continuance Signed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
QDRO
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.