Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith Gallamore, Katherine Marie Cannon, Katherine Marie, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Cannon, Leland David, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Moreland, Charles T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoreland, Charles T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Signed Order
Date: June 12, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: March 07, 2017Proposed Order
Date: December 28, 2016Signed Order
Date: July 06, 2016Answer
Date: June 27, 2016Pre-Dispo Motion to Modify
Date: June 22, 2016Signed Order
Date: June 21, 2016Proposed Order
Date: June 08, 2016Proposed Order
Date: June 06, 2016Answer
Date: June 03, 2016Signed Order
Date: May 03, 2016Letters
Date: April 22, 2016Letters
Date: October 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Confirmation Mailings Letters Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Call/Pre-Trial Conference CANCELED Docket Call/Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Amicus Signed Order Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Family-Non-Jury Scheduling Order Scheduling Order Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Setting Cause to Non-Jury Trial Docket Proposed Order Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.