Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Erin K Faseler, against Hall, Mark Richard, represented by Douglas Kim, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Seiler, Michael T presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Sexual Predator |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Biennial Review Order
Date: October 10, 2016Biennial Review Order
Date: April 24, 2019Signed Order
Date: July 29, 2014Proposed Order
Date: February 08, 2016Letters
Date: August 19, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Clerk's Notice to Defendant Letters Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Biennial Review Order
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Biennial Review Order
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Amended Final Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Seiler, Michael T Party(THE STATE OF TEXASParty(HALL, MARK RICHARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.