Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Edinburg Consolidated Independent School District, Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District # 01, Hidalgo County Emergency Services District # 03, Santa Cruz Irrigation District # 15, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Kelly Rivera Salazar, against Andrus, Paul Robert, Cammack, Susan Rebecca, Martin, Tony, represented by Rodolfo Rudy Canche, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Noe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, Noe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2019 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Hidalgo County, Edinburg Consolidated Independent School District, Hidalgo County Drainage District #01, Hidalgo County Emergency Services District #03, Santa Cruz Irrigation District #15, and South Texas C...
Letter Received
Date: September 11, 2023Notice Returned Unserved
Date: June 29, 2023Notice Sent
Date: June 13, 2023Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: June 13, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 24, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 24, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: April 24, 2023Affidavit
Date: April 20, 2023Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: April 20, 2023Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant
Date: April 20, 2023Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 20, 2023Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: April 20, 2023Notice Returned Unserved
Date: February 28, 2023Notice Sent
Date: February 03, 2023Notice Sent
Date: December 06, 2022Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: February 03, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 05, 2022Notice Returned Unserved
Date: March 14, 2022Notice Returned Unserved
Date: March 07, 2022Notice Sent
Date: March 01, 2022Notice Returned Unserved
Date: March 25, 2022Order to Vacate Judgment, Signed
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 17, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 17, 2022Order Approving Fee for Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: February 14, 2022Motion to Vacate, Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Date: February 14, 2022Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: February 14, 2022Statement of Evidence, Signed
Date: February 14, 2022Final Judgment, Signed
Date: February 14, 2022Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 11, 2022Affidavit
Date: February 11, 2022Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: November 22, 2021Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Ad Litem Fee Order, Signed
Date: November 22, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: December 16, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: November 22, 2021Notice Sent
Date: December 17, 2021Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: November 19, 2021Notice
Date: September 22, 2021Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant
Date: November 19, 2021Non-Military Affidavit
Date: November 19, 2021Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: November 19, 2021Notice Sent
Date: September 21, 2021Notice
Date: September 22, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 21, 2021Notice Sent
Date: November 03, 2020Order on Motion to Amend Return of Citation, Signed
Date: November 02, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 30, 2020Motion to Amend Return of Citation, Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Appearance of Counsel
Date: October 01, 2020Notice Sent
Date: September 29, 2020Answer
Date: October 01, 2020Motion Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 24, 2020Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: September 28, 2020Citation Issued
Date: August 04, 2020Request for Service
Date: August 04, 2020Request for Service
Date: October 18, 2019Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: June 24, 2019Request for Service
Date: May 30, 2019Tax Citation - Certified Mail (Fee)
Date: May 31, 2019Amended Petition
Date: May 30, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: February 14, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Received PAUL ROBERT ANDRES PAUL ROBERT ANDRES Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries HON. KELLY SALAZAR APP'D. JUDGMENT GRANTED; LMK HON. KELLY SALAZAR APP'D. JUDGMENT GRANTED; LMK Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe)
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned Unserved ORDER RESETTING HEARING ORDER RESETTING HEARING Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER RESETTING HEARING ORDER RESETTING HEARING Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING HEARING PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING HEARING Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Re-Setting Hearing
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE - CASE RESET STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE - CASE RESET Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING FEE FOR ATTORNEY AD LITEM - CASE RESET PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING FEE FOR ATTORNEY AD LITEM - CASE RESET Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.