Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew L. Smith, Daniel Cabrera, against Rodriguez, Ricardo, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRicardo Rodriguez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Returned Mail
Date: July 14, 2022Default Judgment, Signed
Date: June 28, 2022Designation
Date: June 16, 2022Returned Mail
Date: June 13, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Order Signed
Date: May 11, 2022Order Filed
Date: May 04, 2022Motion
Date: May 04, 2022Order Granting Subsituted Service, Signed
Date: January 13, 2022Service Returned - Served
Date: March 29, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 15, 2021Returned Mail
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Motion
Date: October 18, 2021Citation Issued
Date: September 09, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 08, 2021Order Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment, Signed SENT VIA EMAIL/MAILED COPY. SENT VIA EMAIL/MAILED COPY. |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment (9:30 AM) () | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE Designation DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail RICARDO RODRIGUEZ; OSH ON DJ. RICARDO RODRIGUEZ; OSH ON DJ. |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of default judgment hearing Notice of default judgment hearing |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Signed OSH FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OSH FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue OSH DEFAULT JUDGMENT OSH DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Default Judgment Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.