Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Casanova, Mario Garza, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Katie P. Klein, against Arturo Jorge Aguilera, Indivually And Dba Texas Real Energy And Associates Group, Texas Real Energy, Incorporated, Individually And Dba Texas Real Energy And Associates Group, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 18, 2019Affidavit
Date: April 06, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 12, 2021Notice Sent
Date: February 04, 2021Order Granting Motion for Substituted Service, Signed
Date: February 02, 2021Motion for Substitute Service, Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Citation Issued
Date: October 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Received EVIDENCE : EMAIL OF MR. MARIO GARZA CASANOVA FILED BY ARTURO JORGE AGUILERA EVIDENCE : EMAIL OF MR. MARIO GARZA CASANOVA FILED BY ARTURO JORGE AGUILERA |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF SERVICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBTITUTED SERVICE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBTITUTED SERVICE |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Substituted Service, Signed | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSSTITUTED SERVICE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSSTITUTED SERVICE |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitute Service, Filed | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Tijerina, Jaime) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation TEXAS REAL ENERGY, INCORPORATED, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA TEXAS REAL ENERGY AND ASSOCIATES GROUP Served 03/13/2021 Returned 04/05/2021 ARTURO JORGE AGUILERA, INDIVUALLY AND DBA TEXAS REAL ENERGY AND ASSOCIATES GROUP Served 03/13/2021 Returned 04/05/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.