Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Magic Valley Concrete, Llc D B A Capa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jose W. Hernandez, against Mar Designs And Construction, Rodriguez, Mario, represented by David A. Ewers, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 476th District Court with Ysmael D. Fonseca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House476th District Court |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 07, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 16, 2023Motion
Date: March 31, 2021Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Notice Sent
Date: April 17, 2020Notice Sent
Date: August 17, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 06, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 13, 2024Notice Sent
Date: August 17, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 31, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 14, 2024Amended Petition
Date: February 13, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 17, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 29, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Suggestion of Bankruptcy (OCA) (1b)
Date: September 05, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 05, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 09, 2020Notice Sent
Date: April 07, 2021Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 16, 2019Citation Issued
Date: August 29, 2019Proposed Order
Date: March 09, 2020Transfer to 476th District Court
Date: August 04, 2023Notice Sent
Date: December 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D.) RESET IN COURT 03.27.24 (MDL) RESET IN COURT 03.27.24 (MDL) |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D.) OSH signed 3-13-2024.rmn OSH signed 3-13-2024 |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Phone Call asst Brenda w/atty J.Hdz office called and noted case has a suggestion of bankruptcy filed Sept.2023.Noted atty cannot appear due to that. Court noted and will make note his call to the court.rmn asst Brenda w/atty J.Hdz office called and noted case has a suggestion of bankruptcy filed Sept.2023.Noted atty cannot appear due to that. Court noted and will make note his call to the court |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries OSH PREPARED BY COURT SIGNED AND SENT TO CLRK TO SEND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES.RMN OSH PREPARED BY COURT SIGNED AND SENT TO CLRK TO SEND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries OSH PREPARED BY COURT SENT FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE.RMN OSH PREPARED BY COURT SENT FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED THREE TIMES NO APPEARANCES. CASE HAS BEEN ABATED PENDING BANKRUPCY. JUDGE FONSECA 10.18.23 MDL CASE CALLED THREE TIMES NO APPEARANCES. CASE HAS BEEN ABATED PENDING BANKRUPCY. JUDGE FONSECA 10.18.23 MDL |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D.) ON PLTFS MSH OSH SIGNED 8.16.23 MDL Result: Held ON PLTFS MSH OSH SIGNED 8.16.23 MDL |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fonseca, Ysmael D., Jr.) ON PLTFS MSH OSH SIGNED 8.16.23 MDL Result: Held ON PLTFS MSH OSH SIGNED 8.16.23 MDL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.