Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cantu, Jr., Tomas, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jordan King, against Bsi Financial Servivces Inc., Karly, David, Larew, William D., Martin, Julie, Mendoza, Arnold, (total of 8) See All represented by Crystal Roach, Mark D. Hopkins, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Receipt
Date: February 12, 2021Notice Sent
Date: January 28, 2021Order Signed
Date: January 27, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 25, 2021Notice Sent
Date: December 30, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 30, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: December 04, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 04, 2020Motion
Date: December 04, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 04, 2020Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 18, 2020Notice Sent
Date: September 25, 2020Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 04, 2020Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Order Returned by Court
Date: August 24, 2020Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: August 20, 2020Notice Sent
Date: April 21, 2020Proposed Order
Date: April 13, 2020Order Signed
Date: April 14, 2020Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: April 13, 2020Notice Sent
Date: January 23, 2020Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: January 23, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 20, 2020Order Signed
Date: November 14, 2019Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: November 08, 2019Notice
Date: November 07, 2019Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 07, 2019Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 05, 2019Amended
Date: November 05, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 04, 2019Amended
Date: November 04, 2019Notice Sent
Date: November 01, 2019Notice
Date: November 01, 2019Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: October 31, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 31, 2019Receipt
Date: October 31, 2019Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 31, 2019Motion
Date: October 30, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: October 30, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 16, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 04, 2019Notice Sent
Date: September 25, 2019Order Returned by Court
Date: September 25, 2019Notice Sent
Date: September 16, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 29, 2019Objection
Date: September 04, 2019Response
Date: August 13, 2019Notice Sent
Date: July 12, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 24, 2019Motion
Date: June 24, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 12, 2019Notice Sent
Date: February 20, 2019Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: February 20, 2019Notice Sent
Date: October 19, 2018Proposed Order
Date: February 20, 2019Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 20, 2019Answer
Date: November 02, 2018Proposed Order
Date: October 17, 2018Bond
Date: October 23, 2018Notice Sent
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Non-Suit, Signed
Date: October 15, 2018Order Signed
Date: October 19, 2018Proposed Order
Date: October 11, 2018Notice Sent
Date: October 05, 2018Proposed Order
Date: October 04, 2018Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order, Signed
Date: October 05, 2018Motion for Non-Suit
Date: October 11, 2018Answer
Date: October 11, 2018Request for Service
Date: September 28, 2018Notice Sent
Date: September 28, 2018Temporary Restraining Order, Signed
Date: September 28, 2018Bond
Date: September 28, 2018Order Returned by Court
Date: September 27, 2018Proposed Order
Date: September 27, 2018Temporary Restraining Order
Date: September 24, 2018Amended
Date: September 27, 2018Notice Sent
Date: September 25, 2018Temporary Restraining Order, Signed
Date: September 25, 2018Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 24, 2018Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: March 04, 2020Answer
Date: December 23, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 21, 2020Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Citation Issued
Date: November 25, 2019Request for Service
Date: November 20, 2019Notice Sent
Date: November 15, 2019Amended Petition
Date: November 20, 2019Response
Date: November 13, 2019Letter Received
Date: November 18, 2019Notice Sent
Date: November 15, 2019Amended
Date: November 13, 2019Order Signed
Date: November 14, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 13, 2019Amended
Date: November 13, 2019Amended
Date: November 13, 2019Amended
Date: November 13, 2019Notice Sent
Date: November 12, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 12, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 12, 2019Motion
Date: November 12, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 08, 2019Jury Demand
Date: October 28, 2019Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: October 30, 2019Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: October 29, 2019Notice Sent
Date: October 25, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 25, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 24, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Answer
Date: October 24, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 21, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 23, 2019Motion
Date: October 21, 2019Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 23, 2019Amended Answer
Date: October 22, 2019Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 18, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 21, 2019Receipt
Date: March 09, 2022Motion
Date: February 22, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Notice Sent
Date: March 04, 2022Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, Signed
Date: February 15, 2022Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 18, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 16, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: February 11, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 11, 2022Objection
Date: February 11, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 07, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 08, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 08, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 07, 2022Motion
Date: February 04, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 07, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 07, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 04, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 04, 2022Objection
Date: February 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 04, 2022Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: February 03, 2022Motion
Date: February 03, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 03, 2022Motion
Date: February 03, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 03, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 02, 2022Receipt
Date: January 20, 2022Amended
Date: January 24, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 24, 2022Receipt
Date: December 15, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 08, 2021Notice Sent
Date: December 16, 2021Order Signed
Date: December 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Sent
Date: November 17, 2021Motion
Date: November 08, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 17, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: August 24, 2021Answer
Date: September 13, 2021Receipt
Date: June 25, 2021Amended
Date: July 14, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 30, 2021Receipt
Date: May 13, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: May 10, 2021Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 29, 2021Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: March 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt ORIGINAL RECEIPT SR-2022-0115-POSTED ON 03/9/22; WRONG TILL BY ERROR; RE-POST ON 03/10/22- SR-2022-0116- ON REGISTR ACCT. ORIGINAL RECEIPT SR-2022-0115-POSTED ON 03/9/22; WRONG TILL BY ERROR; RE-POST ON 03/10/22- SR-2022-0116- ON REGISTR ACCT. Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt FEB AND MARCH PAYMENT FEB AND MARCH PAYMENT Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) Defendants' Fifth Motion to Dissolve Injunction Defendants' Fifth Motion to Dissolve Injunction Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Called Appearing were Attys. Mark D. Hopkins and Caroline Allen and Plaintiff Tomas Cantu Jr.. Atty. Hopkins urged his motion to Dissolve Injunction. Atty. Hopkiins advised the court that the taxes for 2020 have not been paid. He would like to withdraw money from the money that is in trust to pay for the taxes. Judge granted. Money is to be withdrawn to pay taxes Judge advised Plaintiff Tomas Cantu that he is to continue depositing monies into the court's registry. If it is not paid, temporary injunction will be dissolved. Judge gave Mr. Cantu a deadline of 03/11 in which to make the fabruary payment. Appearing were Attys. Mark D. Hopkins and Caroline Allen and Plaintiff Tomas Cantu Jr.. Atty. Hopkins urged his motion to Dissolve Injunction. Atty. Hopkiins advised the court that the taxes for 2020 have not been paid. He would like to withdraw money from the money that is in trust to pay for the taxes. Judge granted. Money is to be withdrawn to pay taxes Judge advised Plaintiff Tomas Cantu that he is to continue depositing monies into the court's registry. If it is not paid, temporary injunction will be dissolved. Judge gave Mr. Cantu a deadline of 03/11 in which to make the fabruary payment. Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) Other Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G)
Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON DEFENDANTS' FIFTH MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION ON DEFENDANTS' FIFTH MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS FIFTH MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUCTION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS FIFTH MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUCTION Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Called HEARING BY ZOOM: Appearing were Attys. Jason Sanders and Mark Hopkins and Plaintiff, Tomas Cantu, Jr. Mr. Cantu advised that he has not retained an attorney yet but he has talked to an attorney about representation. Judge gave him more time in which to retain an attorney. Mr. Sanders then asked the judge as to a setting on his Motioin to Dissolve Injunction. a Date was given. HEARING BY ZOOM: Appearing were Attys. Jason Sanders and Mark Hopkins and Plaintiff, Tomas Cantu, Jr. Mr. Cantu advised that he has not retained an attorney yet but he has talked to an attorney about representation. Judge gave him more time in which to retain an attorney. Mr. Sanders then asked the judge as to a setting on his Motioin to Dissolve Injunction. a Date was given. Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) AS TO MR. CANTU RETAINING COUNSEL AS TO MR. CANTU RETAINING COUNSEL Judge: Tijerina, Jaime) Party(Mendoza, Arnold; Larew, William D.; Martin, Julie; Karly, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.