Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Comack Investments, L.P., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David Denton Rapp, against Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Brown, Penny, Cantu, Mayella, Goldcat, Llc, King, John, (total of 16) See All represented by David J. Hargis, Francisco J. Rodriguez, Jeanne E. Holmes, Ricardo Perez, Robert L. Guerra, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 370th District Court with Gonzalez, Noe Party(Cuevas Gomez, Nicolas; Banos de Cuevas, Maria Josefina; Cuevas, Daniel Reyes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House370th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 18, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Notice Returned Unserved
Date: March 06, 2023Motion
Date: May 31, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Motion To Withdraw as Counsel of Record
Date: March 20, 2024Motion
Date: February 28, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 18, 2023Receipt
Date: October 03, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 02, 2023Objection
Date: June 06, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 30, 2023Notice Sent
Date: February 28, 2023Receipt
Date: May 02, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 15, 2022Motion to Consolidate, Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, Filed
Date: December 15, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 18, 2023Proposed Order
Date: December 13, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 14, 2022Motion
Date: February 28, 2023Temporary Restraining Order, Signed
Date: May 02, 2023Request for Service
Date: January 26, 2023Amended Petition
Date: August 12, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 28, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 18, 2023Notice
Date: October 13, 2022Notice
Date: October 02, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 07, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 18, 2023Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: June 21, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 15, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 28, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 30, 2022Order for Intervenors Nonsuit, Signed
Date: June 20, 2023Order Granting Consolidation, Signed
Date: October 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 29, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 03, 2021Request
Date: August 31, 2023Notice
Date: February 28, 2023Motion
Date: May 16, 2023Notice Sent
Date: July 18, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 29, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 09, 2021Order Signed
Date: September 02, 2022Answer
Date: September 03, 2021Answer
Date: September 06, 2022Receipt
Date: August 25, 2022Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: July 18, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 13, 2021Citation Issued
Date: July 29, 2021Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: February 07, 2022Notice
Date: August 23, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 30, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 28, 2022Notice Returned Unserved
Date: February 27, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 14, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 18, 2023Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Returned Undeliverable
Date: February 18, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 13, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 13, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 24, 2021Subpoena Filed
Date: November 15, 2022Motion
Date: November 16, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 07, 2022Verification
Date: May 02, 2023Order Signed
Date: May 15, 2023Order Signed
Date: September 08, 2022Notice
Date: October 13, 2022Motion
Date: May 18, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 02, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 08, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 08, 2023Proposed Order
Date: May 30, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy, Filed (On Inactive Case)
Date: October 02, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 28, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: February 21, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 28, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: June 30, 2022Jury Demand
Date: September 13, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 01, 2024Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Motion
Date: May 15, 2023Order on Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: February 21, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 10, 2022Notice
Date: June 12, 2023Letter Received
Date: March 30, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 13, 2021Plea of Intervention
Date: December 02, 2022Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: May 18, 2023Motion
Date: September 08, 2022Motion for Temporary Orders, Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: May 24, 2023Notice Sent
Date: December 18, 2023Defendant's Original Answer
Date: March 15, 2023Notice Sent
Date: December 14, 2023Notice
Date: August 07, 2023Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: August 08, 2022Order Signed
Date: May 08, 2023Citation Issued
Date: August 25, 2022Objection
Date: September 27, 2022Amended Answer
Date: September 10, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: December 05, 2022Jury Demand
Date: September 03, 2021Proposed Order
Date: October 25, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 02, 2023Amended
Date: December 05, 2022TRO Issued
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Sent
Date: March 01, 2024Notice
Date: February 28, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 14, 2022Motion
Date: May 17, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 18, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 14, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 20, 2024Cover Letter
Date: August 23, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 14, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 03, 2023CIT/NSC Issued
Date: October 03, 2023Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Special Exceptions
Date: September 13, 2021Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Proposed Order
Date: October 12, 2023Notice Sent
Date: May 19, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: May 15, 2023Notice Sent
Date: March 22, 2024Request
Date: February 21, 2023Notice Sent
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Application
Date: May 01, 2023Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Motion
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 15, 2023Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: October 06, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 02, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 03, 2023Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: October 06, 2023Amended Answer
Date: December 12, 2022Citation Issued
Date: September 02, 2022Notice Sent
Date: June 13, 2023Petition
Date: September 01, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 03, 2021TRO Issued
Date: May 02, 2023Motion
Date: May 26, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 22, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 15, 2022Plea of Intervention
Date: October 02, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 17, 2022Request
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe)
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries HON. GREG KERR AND HON. RICARDO GONZALEZ APP'D, MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS GRANTED; LMK HON. GREG KERR AND HON. RICARDO GONZALEZ APP'D, MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS GRANTED; LMK Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe) Expunge Notice of Lis Pendens Expunge Notice of Lis Pendens Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion To Withdraw as Counsel of Record
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Judge: Gonzalez, Noe Party(Ewers, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.