Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Brown, Dean A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stuart Ryan White, against Mendoza, Adrian, Murphy Wall Products International, Inc., represented by Matthew Ryan Gelina, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice Sent
Date: March 11, 2024Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: March 11, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 08, 2024Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 20, 2024Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 16, 2024Notice Sent
Date: February 13, 2024Amended
Date: January 30, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: January 24, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: January 12, 2024Order Returned by Court
Date: January 24, 2024Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 11, 2024Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: January 16, 2024Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: January 11, 2024List
Date: January 03, 2024Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 03, 2024Amended
Date: January 03, 2024Witness List
Date: January 03, 2024Proposed Order
Date: January 02, 2024Notice
Date: January 02, 2024Notice
Date: January 02, 2024Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: December 27, 2023Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Date: December 21, 2023Notice
Date: December 20, 2023Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: December 14, 2023Amended
Date: December 12, 2023Witness List
Date: December 08, 2023Brief
Date: December 04, 2023Brief
Date: December 04, 2023Brief
Date: December 04, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 30, 2023Response
Date: November 29, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 29, 2023Notice
Date: November 29, 2023List
Date: November 29, 2023Response
Date: November 29, 2023Response
Date: November 29, 2023Proposed Order
Date: November 29, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 16, 2023Order Signed
Date: October 05, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Motion
Date: October 04, 2023Proposed Order
Date: October 04, 2023Appearance of Counsel
Date: October 04, 2023Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: September 29, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: September 28, 2023List
Date: September 28, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 28, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: September 28, 2023List
Date: September 28, 2023Pre-Trial Hearing Order
Date: September 28, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: September 25, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: August 21, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: August 22, 2023Amended Petition
Date: August 22, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: August 17, 2023Proposed Order
Date: August 16, 2023Response
Date: August 10, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: August 07, 2023Notice of Delivery
Date: July 18, 2023Notice Sent
Date: July 07, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 06, 2023Notice of Delivery
Date: June 28, 2023Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 27, 2023Proposed Order
Date: June 27, 2023Notice of Intent to Take Written Deposition
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Intention to Take Deposition on Written Questions
Date: June 06, 2023Subpoena Returned
Date: May 22, 2023Designation of Experts
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Filing of Affidavits with Exhibits
Date: March 07, 2023Order Denying, Signed
Date: February 09, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 05, 2023Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: January 05, 2023Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: September 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 14, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 12, 2022Proposed Order
Date: January 03, 2023Citation Issued
Date: July 27, 2022Request for Service
Date: July 26, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Preferential Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order, Signed AMENDED AMENDED |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition OF ADAM GRILL OF ADAM GRILL |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition OF AIDE SORRELS OF AIDE SORRELS |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MURPHY WALL PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL. INC, AND ADRIAN MENDOZA RULE 166 MOTION ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MURPHY WALL PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL. INC, AND ADRIAN MENDOZA RULE 166 MOTION |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO RULE 194.2 DISCLOSURES DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO RULE 194.2 DISCLOSURES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.