Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aguilar, Blanca Estela, Aguilar, Yvette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lucia Ceaser, against Gomez, Jesus Elio, Jr., represented by Frank Sabo, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice Sent
Date: July 07, 2023Motion
Date: January 13, 2023Agreed Order, Signed
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Change of Address
Date: June 14, 2023Answer
Date: January 13, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 17, 2023Citation Issued
Date: April 07, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 06, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 10, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: October 05, 2023Notice Sent
Date: September 06, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 13, 2023Jury Demand
Date: August 28, 2023Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: September 01, 2023Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: September 06, 2023Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: July 07, 2023Notice
Date: January 13, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 18, 2023Notice Sent
Date: August 10, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 04, 2022Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Application
Date: August 14, 2023Notice Sent
Date: February 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2025 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
January 16, 2025 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Scire Facias Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Scire Facias |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Under Advisement Defendant's Jesus Elio Gomez, No-evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant's Jesus Elio Gomez, No-evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) Defendant's, Jesus Elio Gomez, No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant's, Jesus Elio Gomez, No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Sent to Workflow Queue | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance, Filed | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.