Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Estrada, Israel Edward, The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Laura Martinez Barbosa, represented by Laura Martinez Barbosa, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 398th District Court with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2024 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Filing Court House398th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Writ Issued
Date: March 14, 2024Application
Date: March 11, 2024Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 07, 2024Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: March 19, 2024Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: March 20, 2024Request
Date: March 07, 2024Notice Sent
Date: March 14, 2024Request
Date: March 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED BY JUDGE ESPARZA, ATTY LAURA BARBOSA PRESENT FOR DEF. ANALIZ VARGAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. BOND REDUCED TO 1,000 C/S. RUAS CURFEW 8PM-7AM CASE CALLED BY JUDGE ESPARZA, ATTY LAURA BARBOSA PRESENT FOR DEF. ANALIZ VARGAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. BOND REDUCED TO 1,000 C/S. RUAS CURFEW 8PM-7AM Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Esparza, Larry)
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ ESTRADA, ISRAEL EDWARD Served 03/15/2024 Returned 03/18/2024
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application FOR APPOINTMENT FOR APPOINTMENT Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.