Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by I. Cecilia Garza, against Hernandez, Noe, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSingleterry, Luis M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2019 |
CategoryPetition / Seizure / Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Notice Sent
Date: January 19, 2021Request
Date: January 19, 2021Notice Sent
Date: January 15, 2021Order Nunc Pro Tunc, Signed
Date: January 15, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 30, 2020Order Nunc Pro Tunc, Signed
Date: January 15, 2021Notice Sent
Date: December 09, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 08, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 30, 2020Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc
Date: November 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 30, 2020Bill of Cost
Date: October 23, 2019Default Judgment, Signed
Date: October 08, 2019Notice Sent
Date: September 04, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 03, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: September 03, 2019Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 04, 2019Certificate of Service, Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 03, 2019Certificate of Service, Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Certificate of Service, Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Citation Issued
Date: July 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request CERTIFIED JUDGMENT CERTIFIED JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Nunc Pro Tunc, Signed DEFAULT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Nunc Pro Tunc, Signed GRANTING JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC GRANTING JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Submission (1:00 PM) () Default Judgment NUNC PRO TUNC - no answer Default Judgment NUNC PRO TUNC - no answer Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.