Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Orlando Esquivel, against Maldonado, Anthony Demarco, represented by Jesus Contreras, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 206th District Court with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryFugitive Warrant |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House206th District Court |
Agreed Order, Signed
Date: August 20, 2021Court Entries
Date: August 18, 2021Court Order Modifying Conditions Of Bond,Signed
Date: August 04, 2021Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: August 04, 2021Court Entries
Date: August 11, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: August 05, 2021Order, Signed
Date: August 04, 2021Court Entries
Date: August 02, 2021Notice Sent
Date: July 28, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 27, 2021Order, Signed
Date: July 26, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: July 27, 2021Motion
Date: July 26, 2021Court Entries
Date: July 22, 2021Court Entries
Date: July 08, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: July 01, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: June 30, 2021Court Entries
Date: June 28, 2021Fugitive Warrant (OCA)
Date: June 10, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 11, 2021Order Appointing Attorney, Signed
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing Other CANCELED Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other GOVERNOR'S WARRANT (ENGLISH) SO 01501114 |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) GOVERNOR'S WARRANT (ENGLISH) SO 01501114 GOVERNOR'S WARRANT (ENGLISH) SO 01501114 |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order, Signed FOR DISCHARGE FOR DISCHARGE |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (ENGLISH) **AGREED ORDER OF DISCHARGE IN JUDGE'S QUEUE** ORDER OF DISCHARGE (ENGLISH) **AGREED ORDER OF DISCHARGE IN JUDGE'S QUEUE** |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order, Signed AGREED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE - SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 8/20/21 AGREED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE - SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 8/20/21 |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; DEFT PRESENT; DEFT WAS ADVISED THAT AN AGREED ORDER OF DISCHARGE WAS SIGNED CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; DEFT PRESENT; DEFT WAS ADVISED THAT AN AGREED ORDER OF DISCHARGE WAS SIGNED |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue AGREED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE AGREED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (ENGLISH) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (ENGLISH) |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AGREED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE AGREED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.