Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Trapp, Elena, Trapp, Sean, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Nieto, Nicholas Joseph, against Ward Brown Builders, Ward-Brown Partners Llc, represented by Powers, Matthew Kevin, Schreck, Andrew Zwayer, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts District with JERALYNN MANOR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
This complaint document is related to case number 2021-45494, filed in Court 80. The specific details of the complaint are not provided in the given text. However, the document requests a summary of the text, identification of any dollar amounts ment...
Exhibit A
Date: February 10, 2023Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence
Date: February 10, 2023Certificate of Nonappearance for the Deposition of Alan Charles Weiner, February 3, 2023
Date: February 13, 2023Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence
Date: February 10, 2023DEFENDANT'S RULE 193.7 NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY PLAINTIFF
Date: February 13, 2023Correspondence to the Court requesting an oral hearing
Date: February 16, 2023Exhibit C
Date: February 16, 2023Exhibit E
Date: February 24, 2023Exhibit A
Date: February 16, 2023Exhibit B
Date: February 24, 2023ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: February 28, 2023Exhibit A
Date: February 24, 2023Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant's Designation of Responsible Third Parties
Date: February 24, 2023Reporters Certification Deposition of Alan Charles Weiner, February 13, 2023
Date: March 13, 2023Exhibit M
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit L
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit D
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit H
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit I
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit G
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit E
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit F
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit C
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit B
Date: March 17, 2023Exhibit A
Date: March 17, 2023Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 22, 2023Letter from Nicholas Nieto to Court Regarding Request for Oral Hearing:
Date: March 17, 2023Letter to Court requesting Oral Hearing
Date: March 23, 2023Exhibit D
Date: March 23, 2023Exhibit C
Date: March 23, 2023Exhibit B
Date: March 23, 2023Exhibit A
Date: March 23, 2023Plaintiffs’ Amended Motion To Exclude Witnesses And Evidence
Date: March 23, 2023Exhibit 2
Date: April 12, 2023Amended Affidavit of Nicholas J. Nieto
Date: April 12, 2023Exhibit 3
Date: April 12, 2023Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence
Date: March 31, 2023Exhibit 1
Date: April 12, 2023Letter to Court re Amended Attorney Fee Affidavit
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING BY SUBMISSION (REHR 6.5.2023):
Date: May 19, 2023Final Order:
Date: August 22, 2023Request For Emergency Virtual Hearing
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: April 20, 2023ORDER SIGNED DENYING EXCLUSION OF EXPERTS OPINIONS
Date: April 17, 2023ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: June 27, 2023DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: August 24, 2023NOTICE OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE, CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION, AND ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: August 15, 2023Amended Order Granting Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 20, 2023Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice:
Date: August 22, 2023Notice of Delivery- A & M Engineering LLC (Business)
Date: February 28, 2023Order Granting Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: February 07, 2023Exhibit B
Date: February 10, 2023Subpoena Return of Service- Tony Brown
Date: February 03, 2023Exhibit C
Date: February 24, 2023Exhibit D
Date: February 24, 2023Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 10, 2023Exhibit B
Date: February 16, 2023Subpoena Return of Service-David Ward
Date: February 03, 2023ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED
Date: January 19, 2023Exhibit F
Date: February 10, 2023Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 10, 2023Exhibit D
Date: February 10, 2023Exhibit C
Date: February 10, 2023Exhibit E
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DEPOSITION APPEARANCE
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DEPOSITION APPEARANCE
Date: February 28, 2023ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 20, 2023Unopposed Motion of Non-Resident Attorney Mark D. Boynton for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: January 18, 2023Plaintiffs Trial Exhibit List
Date: January 13, 2023Plaintiffs List of Trial Witnesses
Date: January 13, 2023DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL
Date: January 18, 2023Exhibit A
Date: January 18, 2023Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 10, 2023Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Witnesses and Evidence
Date: February 10, 2023Plaintiffs Notice of Submission (XTAI 2.27.2023):
Date: February 16, 2023Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Designation of Responsible Third Parties
Date: February 24, 2023Plaintiffs Notice of Submission (QUDE 1.23.2023):
Date: January 12, 2023PROPOSED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH:
Date: January 12, 2023Plaintiffs Notice of Submission (LD3P 1.23.2023):
Date: January 12, 2023Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Submission on Defendants Motion to Quash (QUDE 1.23.2023):
Date: January 10, 2023Ex A
Date: January 10, 2023DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONS OF TONY BROWN AND DAVID WARD
Date: January 10, 2023Letter to Court requesting Hearing
Date: January 10, 2023Exhibit E- Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production to Defendant
Date: December 29, 2022Letter to Clerk - Jury Fee
Date: December 27, 2022Exhibit C- Order Granting Continuance
Date: December 29, 2022Exhibit B- Defendant Ward-Brown Partners, LLC d/b/a Ward Brown Builder's Initial Disclosures
Date: December 29, 2022Exhibit A
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: December 21, 2022Ex B
Date: January 10, 2023Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: July 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Order: | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice: | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE, CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION, AND ADDRESS CHANGE | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED DENYING REHEARING | |
June 05, 2023 |
RE-HEARING (MOTION FOR) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) SEE O/S 6.27 |
||
June 05, 2023 |
RE-HEARING (MOTION FOR) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
May 22, 2023 |
RE-HEARING (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.