Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nayer, Gautam, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Rosenberg, Gregg M., Sprovach, Ellen, against Texas Southern University, represented by Lee, Summer Rayne, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 234th with LAUREN REEDER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLAUREN REEDER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2019 |
CategoryDiscrimination |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court House234th |
Plaintiff's original petition
Date: June 19, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 23, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 18, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: October 13, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: October 14, 2020Proposed Order Continuing May 03, 2021 Trial Setting
Date: December 22, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: December 29, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: December 29, 2020Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Quash
Date: March 08, 2021Proposed Order Continuing July 19, 2021 Trial Setting
Date: March 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 18, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: April 19, 2021ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 22, 2021ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 25, 2021Defendant Texas Southern University's Hybrid Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 26, 2021Proposed Denying Defendant's Hybrid Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Process Request
Date: June 19, 2019Plaintiff Response to Defendant's Hybrid Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: August 23, 2021Vacation Letter
Date: January 31, 2020Exhibit B Amended Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: May 08, 2020Exhibit A Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 08, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 18, 2020Proposed Order Continuing Trial Setting
Date: July 10, 2020Proposed Amended Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: July 10, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: July 14, 2020Vacation Letter
Date: August 17, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: July 16, 2020Proposed Order Continuing February 8, 2021 trial Setting
Date: October 06, 2020Third Joint Motion to Continuance February 8, 2021 Trial Setting
Date: October 06, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 14, 2020Exhibit A - Amended Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: December 22, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 01, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 11, 2021Rule 11 Agreement - Amend Docket Control Order
Date: March 10, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 11, 2021Proposed Amended Docket Control Order
Date: March 12, 2021DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: April 22, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 16, 2021Proposed Order Continuing May 3, 2021 Trial Setting
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
October 25, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
September 20, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting MTN FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED |
||
September 20, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting MTN FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED |
||
August 30, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Temporary Order) | ||
August 30, 2021 |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT-FINAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A) Law Day Docket |
||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Texas Southern University's Reply in Support of Its Hybrid Motion for Summary Judgment | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Defendant Texas Southern University's Reply in Support of Its Hybrid Motion for Summary Judgment | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Denying Defendant's Hybrid Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.