Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Total Petrochemicals & Refining Usa Inc, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Carnegie, Jack Gardiner, Smith, Sarah R., Smith, Sarah Russell, against Kinder Morgan Petcoke Gp Llc, Kinder Morgan Petcoke Lp, represented by Bettis, James M. Jr., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 164th with MICHAEL GOMEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL GOMEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2017 |
CategoryInsurance |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court House164th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Summary Judgment Signed |
Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 06, 2019Plaintiffs' Original Petition
Date: July 20, 2017ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 28, 2019Proposed Order
Date: March 06, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: January 23, 2019Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 21, 2019Response to Kinder Morgan's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 03, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 25, 2019Civil Process request
Date: July 20, 2017Proposed Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 25, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2019Sarah R. Smith's Motion in Support of Danny L. Worker's Pro Hac Vice Motion
Date: June 19, 2019Reply to Response to Motion for Final Summary Judgment
Date: August 19, 2019Public Notice of Motion to Seal a Court Record
Date: May 22, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 03, 2019Proposed Order Granting Danny L. Worker's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 19, 2019Defendant Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff Summary Judgment Evidence
Date: June 03, 2019Danny L. Worker's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 19, 2019Proposed Order Denying Kinder Morgan's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 26, 2019Exhibit D - Decision and Order
Date: August 13, 2019ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: August 17, 2019Letter to Judge Dorfman
Date: July 30, 2020Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Damages
Date: August 13, 2019FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: August 25, 2020Kinder Morgans Brief Regarding Interpretation of Prior Court Orders
Date: May 11, 2020Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Damages
Date: September 09, 2019Proposed Final Summary Judgment
Date: September 09, 2019Exhibit - Texas Credit Letter
Date: September 09, 2019Defendants' First Amended Answer
Date: July 01, 2019Total Petrochemicals and Refining U.S.A., Inc's Expert Designation
Date: July 16, 2019ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: December 06, 2019ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 29, 2020Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Summary Judgment
Date: August 13, 2019Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Damages
Date: August 13, 2019ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED
Date: January 19, 2021Letter to Judge Gomez
Date: October 02, 2019Letter to Judge Dorfman
Date: August 06, 2020Response to Sur-Reply Regarding Motion for Final Summary Judgment
Date: September 09, 2019Response to Kinder Morgan's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages
Date: September 17, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion to Correct the Judgment
Date: September 23, 2020Kinder Morgan's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs's Damages
Date: September 13, 2019ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: September 16, 2020Kinder Morgan's Motion to Correct the Judgment
Date: September 23, 2020Proposed Corrected Final Summary Judgment
Date: September 23, 2020Exhibit E - Court Order signed 081719
Date: September 24, 2020Exhibit F - Court Order signed 082520
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Order on Motio to Modify. Corrcect, or Reform Judgment
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Amended Final Summary Judgment Order
Date: September 24, 2020Exhibit D - Court Order signed 062519
Date: September 24, 2020Fourteenth Court of Appeals (Letter Regarding Dismissal For Want of Prosecution)
Date: December 28, 2020Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: September 25, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 02, 2020Notice of Appeal
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Appeal
Date: November 20, 2020Chubb's Supplemental Motion to Modify, Correct or Reform Judgment
Date: September 24, 2020Exhibit A Protective Order
Date: December 18, 2020Proposed Order on Motion to Seal
Date: December 18, 2020Exhibit D - Court Order signed 082520
Date: October 02, 2020Proposed Order Denying Kinder Morgan's Motion to Correct the Judgment
Date: October 02, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 01, 2020Public Notice of Motion to Seal a Court Record
Date: December 22, 2020Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants Notice of Submission
Date: September 30, 2020Exhibit C - Court Order signed 081719
Date: October 02, 2020Exhibit A to Proposed Order
Date: December 18, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 24, 2020Kinder Morgan's Motion to Correct the Judgment
Date: September 24, 2020ORDER GRANTING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED
Date: November 06, 2020Total's Response to Def Kinder Morgan's Motion to Correct Judgment
Date: October 02, 2020Joint Motion to file Under Seal
Date: December 18, 2020Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Correct or Reform Judgment
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Corrected Final Summary Judgment
Date: September 24, 2020Civil Process Request (Posting of Public Notice)
Date: December 22, 2020ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED
Date: January 11, 2021Proposed Final Summary Judgment
Date: July 30, 2019Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: January 05, 2021Proposed Order on Motoin to Seal a Court Record
Date: January 15, 2021Subpoena
Date: October 11, 2017DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena on Non-Party TGS Development, LP with Subpoena Duces Tecum
Date: September 22, 2017Defendants' Original Answer
Date: September 08, 2017Defendants Original counterclaim and Request for Disclosure
Date: August 08, 2018PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND
Date: September 19, 2018Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability
Date: May 17, 2019Proposed Amended Docket Control Order
Date: January 22, 2019Kinder Morgan's Brief Regarding Interpretation of Prior Court Orders
Date: May 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED | |
January 19, 2021 | ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Motoin to Seal a Court Record | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED | |
January 11, 2021 | ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
January 11, 2021 |
MTN TO SEAL Law Day Docket |
||
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice by Posting | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Fourteenth Court of Appeals | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Fourteenth Court of Appeals (Letter Regarding Dismissal For Want of Prosecution) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.