Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Peregrine Oil & Gas Lp, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Jones, Michael D., against Hrb Oil & Gas Ltd, Vhpm Llc, represented by Cannaday, Barry F., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEAU MILLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryHomeowners Association |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court House190th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Signed For Non-Adversary (Non-Jury) |
Proposed Order
Date: November 17, 2016Plaintiffs Traitional Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 17, 2016Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: December 29, 2016Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 29, 2016Filing Letter
Date: December 30, 2016Defendants Objection to the Affidavit of Timothy A Austin
Date: January 04, 2017ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2017Plaintiff's Exhibit List To Plaintiff's Response To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: December 30, 2016ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: February 08, 2017Motion for Reconsideration or Clarification
Date: February 10, 2017ORD SGN DENYING RECONSIDERATION
Date: March 08, 2017Notice of Submisison Motion for Reconsideration and / or clarification
Date: February 10, 2017Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration/Clarification
Date: February 17, 2017Proposed Order
Date: February 17, 2017First court of appeals (General Information)
Date: March 10, 2017Notice of Appeal
Date: March 09, 2017Unopposed Motion For Entry Of Final Judgment
Date: April 06, 2017Memorandum Opinion (court of appeals)
Date: August 30, 2018First court of appeals (Postcard)
Date: May 02, 2017Proposed Final Judgment
Date: April 06, 2017Amended Notice of Appeal
Date: May 04, 2017First Court of Appeals
Date: September 19, 2017Filing letter
Date: September 18, 2017Court of Appeals First District
Date: September 19, 2017DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: August 16, 2019Judgment (court of appeals)
Date: August 30, 2018Notice from the first court of appeals
Date: August 30, 2018Defendants' Expert Witness Designation
Date: December 17, 2019Plaintiffs Expert Witness Designation
Date: November 18, 2019Proposed Order Granting Agreed Joint Motion for Continuance
Date: January 06, 2020Defendants' Objection to Alternative Dispute Resolution
Date: December 17, 2019Agreed Joint Motion for Continuance
Date: January 06, 2020Defendants HRB Oil & Gass LTD and VHPM LLC's First Amended Answer
Date: January 06, 2020Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: February 03, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: February 06, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: July 02, 2020Defendants HRB Oil and Gas, LTD. and VHPM, LLC's Second Amended Answer
Date: May 11, 2020Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: May 13, 2020DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: February 11, 2020Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: May 13, 2020Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition
Date: April 30, 2020Plaintiff's Third Amended Original Petition
Date: May 01, 2020Defendant HRB's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Jeff Weems
Date: May 01, 2020Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Continuance
Date: July 01, 2020Unopposed Second Motion for Continuance
Date: July 01, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: December 10, 2020Proposed Order Granting, Agreed Joint Motion For New Trial Setting
Date: January 05, 2021ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY
Date: January 08, 2021Agreed Joint Motion For New Trial Date
Date: January 05, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING
Date: April 27, 2021Proposed Agreed Order for Preferential Trial Setting
Date: April 21, 2021Defendants' Pre-Trial Order Disclosures
Date: May 25, 2021Proposed Order Granting Leave to Amend
Date: May 19, 2021Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: May 19, 2021Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: May 21, 2021Proposed Order Denying Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: May 21, 2021Plaintiffs Trial Preparation Order
Date: May 24, 2021Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: May 21, 2021ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: June 01, 2021Motion for New Trial
Date: July 21, 2021Order for New Trial
Date: July 21, 2021Proposed Order to Modify Judgment
Date: July 22, 2021Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial
Date: July 27, 2021Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Judgment
Date: July 27, 2021Motion to Modify Judgment
Date: July 22, 2021Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion to Modify Judgment
Date: July 29, 2021Vacation Letter
Date: August 06, 2021Proposed Final Judgment
Date: August 20, 2021Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: July 08, 2016Proposed Order
Date: September 20, 2016Defendants HRB Oil & Gas, Ltd, And VHPM, LLCS Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 20, 2016Proposed Order
Date: September 28, 2016ORDER SIGNED GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 13, 2016Plaintiffs Reply to Response to Motion for Continuance
Date: October 07, 2016DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: October 27, 2016Proposed Order
Date: October 13, 2016Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment
Date: November 03, 2016Defendant HRB Oil & Gas Ltd And Vhpm llcs Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: November 03, 2016Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition
Date: November 08, 2016Motion to Enter Judgment
Date: August 20, 2021ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: March 08, 2017ORDER DENYING MODIFICATION AND AMENDING TEMP ORDERS SIGNED
Date: August 18, 2021DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 06, 2020Proposed Final Judgment
Date: June 09, 2021Defendants' Brief on the Oxford Comma
Date: June 09, 2021Plaintiff's Oxford Comma Brief
Date: June 10, 2021Proposed Final Judgment
Date: June 10, 2021Plaintiff's May 31, 2021 Trial Brief on Industry Custom and Practice Evidence
Date: June 10, 2021Plaintiff's Closing Argument Brief
Date: June 10, 2021Proposed Order Denying Request for Additional Findings
Date: July 09, 2021Additional Request for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: July 08, 2021Request for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: June 29, 2021Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Original Petition
Date: May 19, 2021ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: May 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 |
NEW TRIAL (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
||
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Final Judgment | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Enter Judgment | |
August 18, 2021 | ORDER DENYING MODIFICATION AND AMENDING TEMP ORDERS SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MODIFICATION AND AMENDING TEMP ORDERS SIGNED | |
August 16, 2021 |
MODIFY/AMEND TEMP ORDERS (MOTION TO) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Correct Findings of Fact And Conclusions of Law | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Corrected Notice of Submission on Defendants' Motion to Correct Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.