Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mega Builders Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown, Barry Allan, against Bell Enterprises Inc, Bell Tech Enterprises Inc, Trimcos Llc, represented by Juravich, John C., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 215th with ELAINE H PALMER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House215th |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Signed For Defendant On Jury Verdict |
DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: June 03, 2015proposed order
Date: November 27, 2014Proposed Order
Date: February 20, 2015Proposed Order
Date: April 22, 2015First Amended Answer of Defendant Trimcos, LLC
Date: December 01, 2014Plaintiffs Original Answer to Defendant Trimcos Counterclaim
Date: December 02, 2015ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 18, 2015Original Answer of Defendant Bell Tech Enterprises, Inc
Date: October 17, 2014DCA Generic Letter
Date: November 18, 2015Original Answer Of Defendant Trimcos, LLC
Date: September 12, 2014Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 05, 2015plaintiff's first motion for continuance and entry of amended docket control order
Date: April 22, 2015filing letter
Date: October 01, 2014proposed order
Date: February 05, 2015ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2015Proposed Docket Control Order (agreed)
Date: October 01, 2014Defendants' Objection to ADR
Date: March 17, 2015Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
Date: April 22, 2015proposed first amended docket control order
Date: June 03, 2015Plaintiff Original Petition
Date: August 19, 2014ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: May 04, 2015First Amended Original Answer of Defendant Bell Tech Enterprises, Inc
Date: December 01, 2014Agreed Motion for Continuance and Entry of Amended Docket Control Order
Date: December 09, 2015ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: December 10, 2015ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: August 10, 2016Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 13, 2017Mandate ( The Fourteenth Court of Appeals )
Date: October 11, 2018ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: July 18, 2016Defendants' Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment
Date: March 13, 2017Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment and Limiting Issues for Trial
Date: February 24, 2017Second Amended Original Answer of Defendant Trimcos LLC
Date: December 07, 2015Proposed Order
Date: December 09, 2015Proposed Order in Limine
Date: March 31, 2017ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION
Date: November 20, 2017Mega Builder's Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel
Date: November 17, 2017Civil Process Request
Date: August 19, 2014Fourteenth Court of Appeals (Postcards)
Date: September 19, 2017Proposed Order in Limine
Date: March 23, 2017Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motions in Limine
Date: March 23, 2017Proposed Order
Date: November 10, 2017Defendants' Motion in Limine
Date: March 31, 2017Proposed Final Judgment
Date: May 02, 2017Statement of Assets & Liabilities
Date: November 17, 2017Proposed Order
Date: July 19, 2017Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motion for New Trial
Date: June 14, 2017Letter from the Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: October 11, 2018Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial
Date: July 27, 2017ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL SIGNED
Date: July 31, 2017Notice of Submission of Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial
Date: July 19, 2017Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For New Trial
Date: July 27, 2017Notice of Appeal
Date: August 03, 2017Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: August 04, 2017Memorandum Opinion ( Fourteenth Court of Appeals )
Date: August 02, 2018Notice from the Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: September 21, 2017Judgment ( The Fourteenth Court of Appeals )
Date: August 02, 2018Fourteenth court of appeals
Date: September 22, 2017Letter Enclosing Trust Account
Date: September 22, 2017Trimcos' Motion to Compel
Date: November 10, 2017Notice of Opinion Distribution ( Fourteenth Court of Appeals )
Date: August 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Mandate ( The Fourteenth Court of Appeals ) | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter from the Fourteenth Court of Appeals | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum Opinion ( Fourteenth Court of Appeals ) | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment ( The Fourteenth Court of Appeals ) | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Opinion Distribution ( Fourteenth Court of Appeals ) | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Designation of Appellate Record by Appellee Trimcos, LLC | |
November 20, 2017 | ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION (Temporary Order) | ||
November 20, 2017 |
MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) ORDER SIGNED 11-20-2017 |
||
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Mega Builder's Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.