Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Memorial Hermann Health System, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Johnson, Jared Cole, against Alaniz, Ignacio, represented by Painter, Robert W., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 125th with KYLE CARTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategorySworn Account |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House125th |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2012Motion to Substitute Memorial Hermann Health System for Memorial Hermann Hospital System
Date: February 18, 2013proposed Order
Date: February 18, 2013Filing letter
Date: December 31, 2012ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES SIGNED
Date: March 26, 2013Filing letter
Date: April 03, 2013Filing letter
Date: April 10, 2013Proposed Order
Date: May 10, 2013Filing letter
Date: May 10, 2013Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff
Date: May 10, 2013DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 31, 2013Filing letter
Date: May 16, 2013Filing letter
Date: June 10, 2013Proposed Order On Motion For Continuance And Entry Of New Docket Control Order
Date: June 19, 2013Agreed Motion For Continuance And For Entry Of New Docket Control Order
Date: June 19, 2013ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: June 27, 2013TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: August 16, 2013Proposed Order
Date: September 03, 2013Amended Agreed Motion for Continuance and for Entry of New Docket Control Order
Date: September 03, 2013Proposed Docket Control Order
Date: September 03, 2013Proposed Agreed Final Judgment Dismissing All Claims With Prejudice
Date: December 10, 2013Filing letter
Date: September 12, 2013DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 23, 2013ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: September 23, 2013ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: September 24, 2013DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: December 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2014 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
February 03, 2014 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket CASE DISÝOSED 12/13 |
||
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of New Address | |
December 12, 2013 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
December 12, 2013 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Final Judgment Dismissing All Claims With Prejudice | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | reporter's certification to the deposition of ignacio alaniz september 18, 2013 | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | reporter's certification to the deposition of theresa malone september 18, 2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.