Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cypresswood & Fairfield Village Ii Ltd, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Cohen, Ronald M., against Harris County Appraisal District, Harris County Appraisal Review Board, represented by Lefevre Rogers, Jenny Marie, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 333rd with DARYL L. MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryAppeal Appraisal Board |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court House333rd |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Defendant'S Motion |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2009proposed order
Date: October 27, 2010Dismissal Notice
Date: January 07, 2010Defendants original answer
Date: January 13, 2010docket control order
Date: January 26, 2010unopposed motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel
Date: October 27, 2010Plaintiffs First Amended Petition for Review
Date: November 29, 2010ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: October 28, 2010Defendants Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: January 13, 2011ADR letter
Date: January 10, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: February 08, 2011Defendants Partial Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: February 21, 2011proposed order
Date: March 10, 2011plaintiff's response to defendants' plea to jurisdiction
Date: March 10, 2011Proposed order
Date: February 21, 2011Plaintiffs Motion for New Trial
Date: April 15, 2011DISMISSED ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: March 18, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2011 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Motion for New Trial | |
March 18, 2011 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA TO JURISDICTION (Temporary Order) | ||
March 18, 2011 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
March 18, 2011 | DISMISSED ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION (Final Order) | ||
March 18, 2011 |
PLEA TO JURISDICTION (TRCP 120A) Law Day Docket O/S |
||
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | plaintiff's supplemental response to defendant's reply to plaintiff's response to defendant's plea to jurisdiction | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | exhibit d | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | exhibit b |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.