Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
New Stream Real Estate Llc (Formerly Known As Charter Oak Real Estate, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Johns, Jason Gregory, against Charnquist, James, Hendricks, David, Morgan, Fred, represented by Deayala, Emilio F., Perry, Brent Clark, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryEnforce Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court House190th |
Case Outcome TypeEnforcement Of Foreign Judgment Filed |
ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILED
Date: December 28, 2009Filing letter
Date: December 28, 2009Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Foreign Judgment
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Filing of Foreign Judgment
Date: December 28, 2009Notice of Vacation Letter
Date: August 20, 2018Subpoena Pursuant to TRCP 176 to Plaintiff
Date: November 21, 2018Plaintiffs Notice of Foreigh Subpoena
Date: September 19, 2018Subpoena
Date: September 20, 2018Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: September 21, 2018Proposed Order for Confidentiality and Protective order
Date: October 01, 2018Proposed Order Denying Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: October 08, 2018Agreed Motion to Enter Confidentiality and Protective Order
Date: October 01, 2018Exhibit C - Confession of Judgment
Date: October 08, 2018ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION
Date: October 15, 2018Defendant David B Hendricks' Response to Plaintiff's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: October 08, 2018ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED
Date: October 16, 2018Proposed Order Motion to Join Motion to Show Authority
Date: October 29, 2018Proposed Order Granting Hendricks' Motion to Vacate Foreign Judgment
Date: October 29, 2018Proposed Order Granting Hendricks' Motion to Reconsider
Date: October 29, 2018Hendricks' Motion to Reconsider Motion to Vacate a Domesticated Foreign Judgment
Date: October 29, 2018Proposed Order Motion to Show Authority--Order
Date: October 29, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 08, 2018Proposed Order on Motion to Quash
Date: November 12, 2018Defendant James Charnquist's Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protection from Subpoena
Date: November 12, 2018Subpoena
Date: November 12, 2018David Hendricks' SurReply to Plaintiff's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 12, 2018Defendant's Verified Motion to Abate Plaintiff's Enforcement of Foreign Judgment
Date: November 12, 2018Defendant Hendricks' Original Answer
Date: November 14, 2018ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT
Date: November 29, 2018SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED
Date: November 29, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 26, 2018Proposed order on plaintiff's motion to quash subpoena duces tecum
Date: November 26, 2018Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum on It's Designated Representative
Date: November 26, 2018Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Moiton to Vacate Order Abating Case
Date: January 22, 2019Hendricks Motion to Quash and Motion for Protection from Subpoena
Date: November 21, 2018Proposed Order Granting Motions to Abate
Date: November 27, 2018Proposed Severance Order
Date: November 28, 2018Defendant David B Hendricks' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: November 26, 2018Proposed Order
Date: March 01, 2019ORDER SIGNED SETTING ASIDE ORDER
Date: April 02, 2019Letter To Judge
Date: March 01, 2019Proposed Order Denying Motion to Vacate Order of Abatement
Date: March 01, 2019Hendricks' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order of Abatement
Date: March 01, 2019Proposed Order Appointing Receiver And Order Of Reference
Date: April 29, 2019Subpoena on Mr. Charnquist
Date: July 09, 2019Steven Charnquist's Objections to Subpoena to Produce Documents
Date: July 24, 2019Proposed Order
Date: April 17, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 13, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 10, 2019Request for Writ
Date: May 14, 2019Defendant James Charnquist's Motion to Quash Subpoena
Date: November 01, 2019Subpoena
Date: November 01, 2019Proposed Order Receiver and Order Of Difference
Date: May 20, 2019Letter of Filing
Date: May 20, 2019ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED
Date: November 12, 2019Proposed Order Appointing Receiver And Order Of Reference
Date: June 03, 2019Exhibit C - Confession of Judgment
Date: July 27, 2018Subpoena for Defendant David B. Hendricks
Date: August 21, 2018Proposed Order Denying Defendant Hendrick's Emergency Motion To Vacate Foreign Judgment
Date: September 21, 2018Proposed Order on Motion to Vacate
Date: October 08, 2018Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Foreign Judgment
Date: October 08, 2018Hendricks' Motion to Join Sworn Motion to Show Authority to Represent
Date: October 29, 2018Letter of Filing
Date: June 03, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 14, 2019DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT- 02 (Settlement Agreement)
Date: June 14, 2019Proposed Order on Motion to Show Authority
Date: June 17, 2019Proposed Order Plaintiff's Plea to the Jurisdiction of the Ancillary Court
Date: June 18, 2019Letter to Judge
Date: December 03, 2019Request For Civil Post Judgment Writs
Date: December 03, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 04, 2019Proposed Order to Dismiss
Date: July 11, 2019Letter to Judge Miller
Date: July 11, 2019ORDER SGNED DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER
Date: December 05, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 24, 2019Defendant Charnquist Motion to Quash Subpoena
Date: September 13, 2019Defendant James Charnquist's Motion to Quash Subpoena
Date: December 05, 2019Charnquist Brief Regarding Post-Judgment Injunctions
Date: September 13, 2019Defendant James Charnquist Brief Regarding His Second Petition and the Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 13, 2019Defendant James Charnquists Supplemental Brief Regarding Executory Contracts
Date: September 19, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment Abd Dismissing ERCORR 28, LLC As A Party
Date: September 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 06, 2019Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: October 07, 2019Proposed Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 07, 2019ORDER SIGNED DISCHARGING RECEIVER
Date: April 28, 2020Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: December 30, 2019Plaintiff's Reply To Defendants' Response Motion to Strike and Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: October 10, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings
Date: April 29, 2019Subpoena
Date: May 01, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 03, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA TO JURISDICTION
Date: October 25, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 14, 2020Exhibit 03 - Doctors Letter
Date: November 01, 2019Exhibit 01 - Subpoena.Charnquist
Date: November 01, 2019James Charnquist Notice of Release of Judgment Lien
Date: April 13, 2020Defendant James Charnquist Notice of Appeal
Date: November 04, 2019Proposed Order Appointing Receiver and Order of Reference
Date: November 04, 2019Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: November 06, 2019Letter to Judge Miller
Date: November 06, 2019Fourteenth Court of Appeals (Memorandum Opinion)
Date: April 23, 2020Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Date: April 13, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MOTION T0 DISMISS
Date: April 20, 2020Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Date: November 18, 2019Defendant James Charnquist's Second Notice of Appeal
Date: November 21, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 27, 2019Defendant James Charnquist's Emergency Motion to Vacate Order Appointing Receiver
Date: November 27, 2019Letter to Judge
Date: December 04, 2019Subpoena Pursuant to T.R.C.P. 176
Date: December 04, 2019Proposed Order to Quash
Date: December 05, 2019James Charnquist Response to Plea to the Jurisdiction Filed on December 3, 2019
Date: December 06, 2019Amended Third Notice of Appeal
Date: December 06, 2019Exhibit A Request List
Date: December 11, 2019Letter to Judge Miller from Receiver
Date: December 12, 2019Motion Contempt
Date: December 23, 2019Order.Appear.and.Show.Cause
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING PLEA TO JURISDICTION
Date: December 26, 2019Letter from the fourteenth court of appeals
Date: January 09, 2020Exhibit 2 (South Carolina Release of Judgment Lien)
Date: April 13, 2020Exhibit 1 (Partial Release of Judgment Lien)
Date: April 13, 2020Application To Close Receivership, Discharge Receiver and Approve Final Accounting
Date: April 16, 2020Defendant James Charnquist's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice
Date: April 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Lead Counsel's Change of Address | |
April 28, 2020 | ORDER SIGNED DISCHARGING RECEIVER (Temporary Order) | ||
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED DISCHARGING RECEIVER | |
April 27, 2020 |
MOTION TO DISCHARGE RECEIVER Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Fourteenth Court of Appeals (Memorandum Opinion) | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATE | |
April 20, 2020 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MOTION T0 DISMISS (Temporary Order) | ||
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MOTION T0 DISMISS | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order To Close Receivership, Discharge Receiver and Approve Final Accounting | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Application To Close Receivership, Discharge Receiver and Approve Final Accounting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.