Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barragan, Jose, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Arnold, Kurt Brynilde, against Briggs, Brian, Brush Country Claims, Brush Country Claims Ltd, Texas Fair Plan Association, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 157th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2000 |
CategoryInsurance Policy - Hurricane |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court House157th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
Letter Re: Mediation
Date: December 21, 2000Letter regarding: MEDIATION
Date: November 16, 2009ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: June 24, 2009Filing Letter
Date: July 28, 2009Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: June 16, 2009Proposed Order
Date: March 01, 2010Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice
Date: March 01, 2010Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Final Order
Date: December 11, 2009FILING LETTER
Date: March 03, 2010MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 03, 2010DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: March 11, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
March 11, 2010 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
March 11, 2010 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING LETTER | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
March 01, 2010 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Another Docket CASE DISP |
||
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Final Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.