Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gutierrez, Frank (Ind And As Representative Of The Estate Of Theresa, Gutierrez, Michelle, Gutirrez, Amanda, Gutirrez, Frank Jr, Gutirrez, Michelle, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Moss, Abraham, against Demain, Doe, John, Duremdes, Fulgencio P, Memorial Hermann Hospital System, Moore, Frederick, (total of 7) See All represented by Holm, Charles B., Warner, Matthew Jason, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2004 |
CategoryMalpractice (Medical) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House011th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Defendant'S Motion |
Letter dated june 4, 2007 from abraham moss
Date: June 04, 2007APPEALS ASSIGNMENT CARD
Date:Plaintiffs original petition
Date: November 18, 2005Letter dated march 13, 2006 from abraham moss
Date: March 16, 2006Plaintiffs original petition (pg. 1)
Date: November 21, 2005Letter dated january 10, 2006 from charles b. holm
Date: January 10, 2006Defendant, frederick moore, m.d.s original answer
Date: January 10, 2006Defendant, christiane vogt-harenkamp, m.d.s original answer
Date: January 10, 2006Letter dated january 10, 2006 from charles b. hom
Date: January 10, 2006Letter dated march 10, 2006 from abraham moss
Date: March 13, 2006Plaintiffs motion for non-suit of defendant frederick moore, m.d.
Date: March 13, 2006Plaintiffs original petition
Date: March 16, 2006Letter dated march 14, 2006 from abraham moss
Date: March 17, 2006Letter dated march 17, 2006 from mark lott assisting abraham moss
Date: March 21, 2006Letter dated march 18, 2006 from abraham moss
Date: March 21, 2006Plaintiffs motion for non-suit of defendant memorial hermann hospital
Date: March 21, 2006Letter dated april 12, 2006 from abraham moss
Date: April 17, 2006Proposed order
Date: August 08, 2006Letter dated july 18, 2006 from charles b. holm
Date: July 18, 2006Defendant, christiane vogt-harenkamp, m.d.s motion to dismiss with prejudice
Date: July 18, 2006Proposed order
Date: July 18, 2006Letter dated august 8, 2006 from charles b. holm
Date: August 08, 2006Letter dated september 29, 2006 from jason warner
Date: October 02, 2006Rule 11 agreement
Date: December 27, 2006Letter dated november 21, 2006 from jason warner
Date: November 27, 2006Defendant university of texas health science center at houstons opposed motion for continuance
Date: February 02, 2007Letter dated august 10, 2006 from abraham moss
Date: August 14, 2006Letter dated january 30, 2007 from jason warner
Date: February 02, 2007Plaintiffs first amended original petition
Date: August 14, 2006Rule 11 agreement
Date: December 19, 2006Plaintiffs designation of expert witnesses
Date: February 16, 2007Letter dated october 20, 2006 from jason warner
Date: October 23, 2006Letter dated february 9, 2007 from jason warner
Date: February 13, 2007Plaintiffs first motion for continuance
Date: February 15, 2007Letter dated february 16, 2007 from abraham moss
Date: February 19, 2007Plaintiffs second amended original petition
Date: February 20, 2007Letter dated october 17, 2006 from jason warner
Date: October 19, 2006Plaintiffs first amended designation of expert witnesses
Date: February 27, 2007Plaintiffs motion to enlarge time and for leave to serve designation of expert witnesses
Date: February 16, 2007Rule 11 agreement
Date: November 09, 2006Letter dated february 24, 2006 from charles b. holm
Date: February 24, 2007Letter dated february 15, 2007 from abraham moss
Date: February 20, 2007Plaintiffs third amended original petition
Date: March 01, 2007Letter dated march 19, 2007 from abraham moss
Date: March 21, 2007Letter dated may 14, 2007 from jason warner
Date: May 17, 2007Plaintiffs fourth amended original petition
Date: March 21, 2007Letter dated may 2, 2007 from jason warner
Date: May 07, 2007Proposed order granting leave to shorten time to produce documents
Date: May 18, 2007Proposed order on plaintiffs motion to shorten time
Date: March 20, 2007Letter dated march 23, 2007 from jason warner
Date: March 28, 2007Plaintiffs motion to shorten time for production of documents
Date: March 20, 2007Plaintiffs fifth amended original petition
Date: May 16, 2007Letter dated march 20, 2007 from jason warner
Date: March 26, 2007Curriculum vitae and Expert report of Harold S Minkowitz M.D.
Date: May 21, 2007Proposed order granting motion for continuance
Date: May 21, 2007Plaintiffs motion for continuance of defendants motion to dismiss
Date: May 21, 2007Letter dated may 22, 2007 from cynthia minnick
Date: May 24, 2007PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: May 23, 2007Letter dated june 6, 2007
Date: June 08, 2007Appeal Letter
Date: June 05, 2007letter
Date: July 11, 2007Letter dated july 16, 2007 from dale dover
Date: August 20, 2007[Proposed] Order Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 10, 2009Agreed Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 10, 2009Letter dated february 26, 2007 from abraham moss
Date: March 01, 2007Plaintiffs motion for leave to shorten time for production of documents
Date: May 18, 2007PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: April 17, 2006Letter dated march 14, 2007 from jason warner
Date: March 19, 2007Letter dated april 18, 2007 from jason warner
Date: April 23, 2007Letter dated may 18, 2007 from jason warner
Date: May 21, 2007DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: February 17, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2009 |
COURT SCHEDULING ORDER Another Docket |
||
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 17, 2009 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
February 17, 2009 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | [Proposed] Order Motion to Dismiss | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Dismiss | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Docket sheet | |
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Opinion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.