Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Spradlin, Lesley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Spradlin, Daniel, represented by Stacey Lynne Puls, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Ewing, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEwing, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Order Setting Hearing
Date: October 17, 2023Status Report
Date: July 27, 2023Status Conference Sheet
Date: April 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack) Removed from trial docket. Settled. 10/20/2023 Reset by Court to 11/03/2023 11/03/2023 Reset by Court to 11/10/2023 11/10/2023 Reset by Court to 11/17/2023 11/17/2023 Reset by Court to 12/08/2023 Removed from trial docket. Settled. |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Approved by Court (Judicial Officer: Ewing, Jack ) -ED -ED |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Copy of Rule 11 Agreement Proposed Order (unsigned) Rule 11 Agreement -lm Rule 11 Agreement -lm |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Settled CANCELED Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack, Ewing, Jack) Settled |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Motion for Continuance Order Setting Hearing (Judicial Officer: Ewing, Jack ) Motion for Continuance -ED Motion for Continuance -ED |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement - Inventory -ED Rule 11 Agreement Approved by Court (Judicial Officer: Ewing, Jack ) Rule 11 Agreement - Inventory -ED |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisement of Lesley Spradlin Inventory and Appraisement Inventory and Appraisement of Lesley Spradlin |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Verification of Attached Inventory and Appraisement Inventory and Appraisement Verification of Attached Inventory and Appraisement |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.