Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Svsm Homes Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Lozano, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Billy A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Billy A., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff - 0360 |
Case Summary
Date: June 26, 2023Final Order for NonSuit - Case Close (OCA)
Date: June 26, 2023Lease
Date: June 13, 2023Citation and Return
Date: June 16, 2023Notice to Vacate
Date: June 13, 2023Original Petition Eviction - (OCA)
Date: June 13, 2023Citation - Eviction
Date: June 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Order for NonSuit - Case Close (OCA)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Billy A., Jr.)
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lease
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Vacate
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Eviction - (OCA) LM LM Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Service Lozano, Daniel Served 06/14/2023 Returned 06/16/2023
Judge: Williams, Billy A., Jr. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation - Service Lozano, Daniel Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.