Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Russell, Samantha, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Mccarty, Andrea, Woolfson, Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Apffel, D. Blake presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeApffel, D. Blake Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeTrial/Hearings By Judge/Hearings Officer - 0330 |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Date: July 10, 2023Request for Writ of Possession
Date: July 06, 2023Writ of Possession $205
Date: July 06, 2023Final Judgment - All Other Civil Dispositions - (OCA)
Date: June 27, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: June 26, 2023Case Summary
Date: June 27, 2023Citation and Return
Date: June 16, 2023Citation - Paid via EFile
Date: June 15, 2023Petition
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned - Closes Case - (OCA)
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession $205
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment - All Other Civil Dispositions - (OCA)
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Summary
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Eviction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Apffel, D. Blake, Apffel, D. Blake)
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation and Return
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Paid via EFile
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Galveston Office
Judge: Apffel, D. Blake Judgment of $3,300.00Awarded To: Samantha RussellAwarded Against: Andrea McCarty, et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.