Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Hayman, Maureen E., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Charles P Dunkel, Jr., against Galveston Independent School District, represented by Celena Vinson, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 02, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 14, 2023Designation of Witness
Date: February 23, 2024Amended Petition
Date: February 07, 2024Notice of Intent
Date: December 22, 2023Response
Date: August 22, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 10, 2023Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 14, 2023Certificate
Date: March 20, 2024Notice of Intent
Date: February 15, 2024Notice of Intent
Date: December 28, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: September 15, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 13, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 03, 2023Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: July 10, 2023Request for Civil Service
Date: June 14, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: February 15, 2024Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 15, 2023Certificate
Date: March 20, 2024Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 14, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: August 02, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: December 22, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) | |
August 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) 1ST TRIAL SETTING 1ST TRIAL SETTING |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION of MS. JEAN FULLEN Certificate CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION of MS. JEAN FULLEN |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION of MR. JOSEPH PILLER Certificate CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION of MR. JOSEPH PILLER |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rule195_ExpertDesignation Designation of Witness Rule195_ExpertDesignation |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ntc. of Intent -TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEO DEPOSITION OF JERRY GIBSON NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEO DEPOSITION OF JERRY GIBSON Notice of Intent NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEO DEPOSITION OF JERRY GIBSON |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ntc. of Intent - TO TAKE THE ORAL DEPO. F DYANN POLZIN Notice of Intent PLAINTIFF's NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL DEPOSITION OF DYANN POLZIN PLAINTIFF's NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL DEPOSITION OF DYANN POLZIN |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Petition |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Ntc of Intent to take Depo-Piller Notice of Intent Amended Ntc of Intent to take Depo-Piller |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NtcDepo_Fullen Notice of Intent NtcDepo_Fullen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.