Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
17Th Street Properties Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment case represented by Preston J. Dugas, Iii, against Galveston Central Appraisal District, represented by Nicholas Perez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Designation of Attorney of Record
Date: December 14, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 09, 2022Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: December 12, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 13, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 10, 2022Motion
Date: December 09, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 09, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 02, 2022Jury Demand
Date: October 10, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 02, 2022Original Answer
Date: August 29, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: August 01, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 01, 2022Original Petition - OCA
Date: August 01, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Other |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Preston Dugas AS Attorney in charge Designation of Attorney of Record Notice of Preston Dugas AS Attorney in charge |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - PROPOSED Proposed Order (unsigned) AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - PROPOSED |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED JUDGMENT Motion JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Other |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) discovery and d c o discovery and d c o |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Agreed Discovery and DCO- signed Proposed Order (unsigned) Discovery and Docket Control Order Discovery and Docket Control Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.