Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Diverse Equity, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ellyn Julia Clevenger, against Abhashemi, Mahmoud Reza, Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Russe, Dallas, Sr., represented by Brandon Hakari, Christopher C. Pappas, Thomas W. Mcquage, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2022 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Deputy Reporter Statement
Date: September 29, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 08, 2023Answer
Date: October 02, 2023Counter Claim
Date: September 26, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: September 08, 2023Joinder
Date: September 26, 2023Reply
Date: September 07, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: September 25, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: September 22, 2023Certificate
Date: August 28, 2023Motion
Date: September 22, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 22, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 08, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: September 20, 2023Reply
Date: September 08, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: September 05, 2023Response
Date: September 05, 2023Certificate
Date: August 28, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: August 24, 2023Counter Claim
Date: August 04, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 07, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: August 24, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 03, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 10, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 10, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 10, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 09, 2023Designation of Witness
Date: July 31, 2023Special Exceptions
Date: July 10, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 07, 2023Deputy Reporter Statement
Date: June 02, 2023Request for Hearing
Date: August 04, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 03, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 28, 2023Certificate
Date: June 08, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: June 02, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 02, 2023Order to Compel
Date: May 31, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 02, 2023Amended Petition
Date: May 30, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 24, 2023Motion
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2023Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: May 17, 2023Correspondence
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 08, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: May 05, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 01, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 01, 2023Motion
Date: April 28, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: May 01, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: April 26, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 28, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 14, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 28, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: April 28, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 21, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 13, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 13, 2023Notice of Intent
Date: April 04, 2023Order to Compel
Date: March 29, 2023Order on Special Exception
Date: February 06, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: March 21, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: March 17, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 10, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 13, 2023Exhibit(s)
Date: March 10, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: March 10, 2023Order for Non Suit - Partial
Date: February 06, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 06, 2023Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: January 11, 2023Amended Petition
Date: February 03, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 03, 2023Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: February 03, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 01, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 12, 2023Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 05, 2022Declaration
Date: January 03, 2023Supplement
Date: January 03, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 14, 2022Answer
Date: September 09, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 06, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: November 10, 2022Original Answer
Date: August 19, 2022Jury Demand
Date: September 09, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 08, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 26, 2022Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: August 31, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: August 24, 2022Jury Demand
Date: August 19, 2022Plea in Abatement
Date: August 19, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: July 29, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 26, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 15, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 15, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 15, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: July 14, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: July 14, 2022Original Answer
Date: July 13, 2022Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 18, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 18, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: May 02, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 01, 2022Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 01, 2022Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) DEFT'S MTN TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTION AND MTN TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY DEFT'S MTN TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTION AND MTN TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) 1ST TRIAL SETTING 1ST TRIAL SETTING |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Diverse - Defendant's Second Amended Original Answer Answer Deft Dallas Russell, Sr.'s Second Amended Original Answer Deft Dallas Russell, Sr.'s Second Amended Original Answer |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Deputy Reporter Statement Edna Thorton Deputy Reporter Edna Thorton Deputy Reporter |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Counterclaims] Counter Claim DEFT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM DEFT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Joinder] Joinder DEFT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF ADOPTION AND JOINDER OF DEFT DALLAS RUSSELL, SR.'S MTN. TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY DEFT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF ADOPTION AND JOINDER OF DEFT DALLAS RUSSELL, SR.'S MTN. TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Deft's Motion to Compel & For Sanctions-to Exclude Expert Testimony Notice of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel-Sanctions & Exclude Expert Testimony Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel-Sanctions & Exclude Expert Testimony |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Diverse - Request for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Request for Hearing on Deft's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Request for Hearing Request for Hearing on Deft's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Diverse - Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Motion Defendant Dallas Russell, Sr.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Defendant Dallas Russell, Sr.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.