Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bishop, Charlotte, Freeman, Fallon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Musslewhite, Jeff, Jeff Musslewhite, against Green, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Request for Civil Service
Date: June 28, 2021Order
Date: August 25, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: August 23, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 29, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 29, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 28, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 28, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Case Disposed |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Nonsuit. Order (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) Order for Nonsuit. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED- ORDER FOR NONSUIT//LC/re SIGNED- ORDER FOR NONSUIT//LC/re |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on NonSuit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet Emailed to Atty. Emailed to Atty. |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.