Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wheeler, Ray Dean, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David Romagosa, against Galletti, Charles Bernard, Reed, Dylan Dwayne, represented by John S Powell, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 12, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: January 31, 2022Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: January 27, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: December 27, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: December 17, 2021Original Answer
Date: September 28, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: December 16, 2021Exhibit(s)
Date: May 24, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 18, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 18, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 13, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 13, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: May 12, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: May 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 12, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: May 12, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismiss - Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) 01/27/2022 Reset by Court to 01/27/2022 | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes dwop order signed dwop order signed |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-12-27 Ps NOFAs - Wheeler Notice of Filing Wheeler - P's NOFA's Wheeler - P's NOFA's |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) on the dismissal docket, set for Failure to appear for S/C on 12-16-21 @10:00 a.m.has been set for 1-27-22 @9:00 am on the dismissal docket, set for Failure to appear for S/C on 12-16-21 @10:00 a.m.has been set for 1-27-22 @9:00 am |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) date given to pltf counsel D Romagosa to notice all parties and file proof of notice w/ DC Office date given to pltf counsel D Romagosa to notice all parties and file proof of notice w/ DC Office |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes no appearance by any parties no appearance by any parties |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Check Status (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) see notes see notes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.