Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Evans, Connie, Evans, David, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Michael P. Nassif, against Harbour Management, Llc, Mb Harbour, Ltd., represented by Marc D Young, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 05, 2021Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: September 15, 2023Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: September 07, 2023Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: September 05, 2023Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: September 14, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 14, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: February 01, 2023Exhibit Inventory Filed by Court Reporter
Date: February 13, 2023Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: January 31, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 31, 2023Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: January 31, 2023Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: January 24, 2023Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: January 20, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: January 09, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 06, 2023Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: January 06, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 02, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: December 15, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product)
Date: January 02, 2023Abstract of Judgment - Issuance (Work Product)
Date: December 15, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: December 13, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: December 08, 2022Judgment - Final - Jury Verdict - OCA
Date: December 08, 2022Objection
Date: December 01, 2022Objection
Date: December 01, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 17, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: November 16, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 16, 2022Motion
Date: November 15, 2022Jury Charge and Verdict
Date: November 08, 2022Jury Communication to Court
Date: November 08, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: November 15, 2022Jury Strike List
Date: November 07, 2022Jury Strike List
Date: November 07, 2022Order on Motion in Limine
Date: November 07, 2022Jury List - Final - OCA
Date: November 07, 2022Order for Non Suit - Partial
Date: November 07, 2022Trial Exhibit List
Date: November 07, 2022Witness List
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: November 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: November 07, 2022Trial Exhibit List
Date: November 07, 2022Witness List
Date: November 07, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: October 18, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: October 18, 2022Certificate
Date: October 17, 2022Reply
Date: October 13, 2022Certificate
Date: October 17, 2022Response
Date: October 13, 2022Certificate
Date: October 17, 2022Order Granting Summary Judgment - Non Final
Date: October 17, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 06, 2022Certificate
Date: October 13, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 06, 2022Deputy Reporter Statement
Date: October 07, 2022Response
Date: October 06, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 05, 2022Response
Date: October 06, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: October 06, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 06, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: October 06, 2022Response
Date: October 05, 2022Motion to Extend
Date: October 04, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 20, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Intent
Date: September 28, 2022Certificate
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 20, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: September 19, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: September 19, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 19, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: September 19, 2022Motion
Date: September 19, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: September 20, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2022Motion
Date: September 19, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 19, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: September 16, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: September 15, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: September 19, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 15, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 13, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: September 13, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: September 13, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: September 13, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: September 13, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: September 13, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 13, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: September 09, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: June 15, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: June 10, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: June 10, 2022Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: June 10, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: June 08, 2022Answer
Date: May 13, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 08, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: June 08, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 08, 2022Amended Petition
Date: May 13, 2022Original Answer
Date: May 12, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 11, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 10, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 01, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: February 10, 2022Correspondence
Date: February 07, 2022Exhibit(s)
Date: January 31, 2022Affidavit
Date: January 31, 2022Designation of Witness
Date: January 31, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 29, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 14, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: December 13, 2021Jury Demand
Date: July 20, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: June 03, 2021Original Answer
Date: April 12, 2021Citation and Return
Date: March 18, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 11, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 10, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 08, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 10, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 05, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Supplemental CLR Filed. Re: Supplemental CLR Filed. |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy Supplemental CLR - Filed. Supplemental CLR - Filed. |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Supplemental CLR Filed. Supplemental CLR Filed. |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy Supp. CLR ( 25.00); Emailed & Mailed to Atty. Supp. CLR ( 25.00); Emailed & Mailed to Atty. |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for District Clerk Record Supp.; to S.D. Request for Clerk Record on Appeal Request for District Clerk Record Supp.; to S.D. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Inventory Filed by Court Reporter Defendants exhibits Defendants exhibits |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Clerk's Record Filed - Letter. Re: Clerk's Record Filed - Letter. |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy CLR-Vol.002 filed w/14th CRT of Appeals CLR-Vol.002 filed w/14th CRT of Appeals |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email Confirmation of CLR - Vol. 1 & 2 filed. Email Confirmation of CLR - Vol. 1 & 2 filed. |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy CLR-Vol.001 filed w/14th CRT of Appeals CLR-Vol.001 filed w/14th CRT of Appeals |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.