Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Medel, Paola, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David Kent Mestemaker, Papapavlou, John, against Holbrook, Nicholas, represented by Wade Williams, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Request for Civil Service
Date: December 29, 2017Designation of Witness
Date: October 30, 2018Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: January 29, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: April 03, 2019Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA
Date: May 22, 2019Original Answer
Date: June 04, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: January 25, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 22, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 25, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 27, 2019Copy of Notice
Date: May 28, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: May 22, 2019Certificate
Date: March 28, 2019Certificate
Date: March 19, 2019Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA
Date: May 22, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: April 03, 2019Certificate
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Intent
Date: March 29, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 27, 2019Certificate
Date: March 19, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: January 25, 2019Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: March 18, 2019Certificate
Date: March 04, 2019Certificate
Date: February 13, 2019Certificate
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Intent
Date: February 08, 2019Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: January 29, 2019Certificate
Date: December 12, 2018Copy of Notice
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Intent
Date: January 16, 2019Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 25, 2019Certificate
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Intent
Date: January 09, 2019Certificate
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Intent
Date: December 28, 2018Certificate
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: December 20, 2018Certificate
Date: December 12, 2018Certificate
Date: December 12, 2018Certificate
Date: December 12, 2018Certificate
Date: November 16, 2018Designation of Witness
Date: December 05, 2018Certificate
Date: December 10, 2018Certificate
Date: December 05, 2018Certificate
Date: October 04, 2018Certificate
Date: November 21, 2018Certificate
Date: November 16, 2018Certificate
Date: November 06, 2018Designation of Witness
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Intent
Date: October 30, 2018Certificate
Date: October 22, 2018Certificate
Date: October 22, 2018Certificate
Date: October 22, 2018Certificate
Date: October 10, 2018Certificate
Date: October 12, 2018Certificate
Date: October 10, 2018Certificate
Date: October 08, 2018Certificate
Date: September 27, 2018Certificate
Date: September 24, 2018Certificate
Date: September 21, 2018Certificate
Date: September 21, 2018Certificate
Date: September 21, 2018Certificate
Date: September 21, 2018Certificate
Date: September 21, 2018Original Answer
Date: June 04, 2018Certificate
Date: September 05, 2018Certificate
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Intent
Date: August 15, 2018Certificate
Date: August 29, 2018Docket Control Order
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Intent
Date: July 17, 2018Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 22, 2018Jury Demand
Date: June 04, 2018Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: May 10, 2018Request for Civil Service
Date: December 29, 2017Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 20, 2018Notice
Date: March 20, 2018Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: January 03, 2018Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: January 02, 2018Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 02, 2018Receipt Acknowledge
Date: December 29, 2017Status Conference Sheet
Date: December 29, 2017OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: December 29, 2017Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Other |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Signed Final Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Final Judgment |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Signed Final Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.