Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Roberts, Ronald, Rosenberger, Robert Kelton, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by David A. Mcdougald, against Lemaster, Harvey, represented by Randall G. Walters, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
This complaint is a legal document filed by plaintiffs Robert Kelton Rosenberger and Ronald Roberts against Walden Pond Owners Association and Harvey LeMaster. The plaintiffs allege that they have been injured due to the negligence and breach of gove...
Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: August 19, 2021Green Card Returned/Delivered
Date: May 15, 2023Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 20, 2021Appeal - Bill of Cost from Court of Appeal
Date: December 29, 2023Appeal - Opinion
Date: October 17, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: October 17, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: January 04, 2024Correspondence from Clerk of Court
Date: May 08, 2023Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: September 14, 2021Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: September 07, 2021Appeal - Order
Date: May 08, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: June 01, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 21, 2021Appeal - Judgment from Court of Appeals
Date: October 17, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: May 08, 2023Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: September 13, 2021Motion for New Trial
Date: June 21, 2021Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: December 29, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: May 12, 2023Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: September 15, 2021Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: August 19, 2021Order Granting Summary Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: May 20, 2021Appeal - Order
Date: January 04, 2024Notice of Appeal
Date: August 18, 2021Appeal - Opinion
Date: October 17, 2023Appeal - Mandate Affirming
Date: December 29, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 14, 2021Order for Severance - Non Final
Date: May 20, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 19, 2021Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Order to return exhibits to DC Office. Re: Order to return exhibits to DC Office. |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Order to return the original exhibits filed 5/10/2023 (Exh. 3 & 4) to be return to DC to return the original exhibits filed 5/10/2023 (Exh. 3 & 4) to be return to DC |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeal - Bill of Cost from Court of Appeal | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Mandate Issued Letter. Re: Mandate Issued Letter. |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeal - Mandate Affirming | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Opinion Concurring and Dissenting Opinion; Sent to CRT Queue. Concurring and Dissenting Opinion; Sent to CRT Queue. |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Notice of Opinion Distribution Letter. Notice of Opinion Distribution Letter. |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Judgment from Court of Appeals Affirmed TC Jdmt. Affirmed TC Jdmt. |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Opinion Majority Opinion; Sent to CRT Queue. Majority Opinion; Sent to CRT Queue. |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returned/Delivered Re: Exhibits to Response to MSJ Filed per Order. Re: Exhibits to Response to MSJ Filed per Order. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.