Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burns, Sally, The Estate Of Willie Mae Nacol, Davis Family Living Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ewart, Roy K., against Davis Family Living Trust, Gilbert, Marie, represented by Johansono, Allison B., Mcconnell, Paul J., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryContract - Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
OCA Case Information Sheet
Date: March 12, 2014Original Answer
Date: March 11, 2014Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 26, 2014Third Party Petition
Date: February 20, 2014Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 26, 2014Request for Civil Service
Date: February 20, 2014Original Answer
Date: January 22, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (*4 HOURS SET ASIDE FOR BENCH TRIAL.) |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order of Dismissal (unsigned) Proposed Order (unsigned) |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Agreed order |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Info Statement OCA Case Information Sheet Civil Case Information Statement |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Third Party Defts' Original Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.