Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Xxxx, Xxxxxx Xxxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, Stephanie Kay Dromgoole, against Xxxx, Xxxxxxx, represented by Janine Campanaro, Zachary G. Sanders, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts 328th District Court with Monica Rawlins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2023 |
CategoryParent-Child - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House328th District Court |
This complaint is an original petition in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship. The petitioner, xxxxxx xxxx, is the father of the child involved in the suit. The respondent is xxxxxxx xxxx, the child's mother. The suit requests temporary or...
Proposed Order Index # 33
Date: October 23, 2023Officers Return Index # 26
Date: October 10, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 22
Date: October 02, 2023Issuance Index # 8
Date: September 26, 2023Request Index # 6
Date: September 19, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 11
Date: September 26, 2023Parent Education Certificate Index # 36
Date: November 16, 2023Order Appointing Index # 30
Date: October 13, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 20
Date: October 02, 2023Issuance Index # 10
Date: September 26, 2023Order Index # 4
Date: September 22, 2023Officers Return Index # 27
Date: October 12, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 23
Date: October 02, 2023Proposed Order Index # 17
Date: September 28, 2023Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 12
Date: September 26, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: September 19, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 32
Date: October 23, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 34
Date: October 31, 2023Order Index # 25
Date: October 04, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 21
Date: October 02, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 31
Date: October 12, 2023Request Index # 19
Date: September 28, 2023Issuance Index # 16
Date: September 27, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 24
Date: October 03, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 14
Date: September 26, 2023Order Index # 35
Date: November 13, 2023Order Index # 29
Date: October 13, 2023Proposed Order Index # 15
Date: September 26, 2023Order Index # 2
Date: September 22, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 5
Date: September 19, 2023Letters
Date: October 03, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 18
Date: September 28, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 28
Date: October 12, 2023Issuance Index # 9
Date: September 26, 2023Proposed Order Index # 13
Date: September 26, 2023Order Index # 3
Date: September 19, 2023Proposed Order Index # 35
Date: October 31, 2023Proposed Order Index # 4
Date: September 19, 2023Proposed Order Index # 2
Date: September 19, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 5
Date: September 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion for xxxxxxx xxxx Parent Education Certificate Index # 36 Parent Education Certificate Index # 36Certificate of Completion for xxxxxxx xxxx |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Order on Motion to Substitute Order Index # 35 Order Index # 35Agreed Order on Amended Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Motion (No Fee) Index # 34 Motion (No Fee) Index # 34Amended Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Order on Motion to Substitute Proposed Order Index # 35 Proposed Order Index # 35Agreed Order on Amended Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAll counsel must sign the Agreed Order or it must be set for submission. No Action Taken. FRY | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Proposed Order Index # 33 Proposed Order Index # 33Agreed Order on Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Motion (No Fee) Index # 32 Motion (No Fee) Index # 32Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Amicus Attorney Order Appointing Index # 30 Order Appointing Index # 30Order Appointing Amicus Attorney |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Order Index # 29 Order Index # 29Agreed Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 27 Officers Return Index # 27Writ of Attachment Return for xxxxxx xxxx Issued on 10/12/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.