Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Rominiyi, Babafemi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ralphaell V. Wilkins, against Adejuwon, Kehinde Comfort, represented by Omonzusi M. Imobioh, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts 328th District Court with Monica Rawlins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica Rawlins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House328th District Court |
This complaint is an original petition for divorce filed by Babafemi Rominiyi in Fort Bend County, Texas. The petitioner objects to the assignment of the case to an associate judge for trial. Babafemi Rominiyi has been a resident of Texas for the pas...
No Fee Documents Index # 16
Date: January 11, 2024Notice Index # 17
Date: January 11, 2024Order Index # 13
Date: December 07, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 14
Date: December 07, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 15
Date: January 11, 2024No Fee Documents Index # 12
Date: December 04, 2023Amended Filing Index # 11
Date: December 04, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 10
Date: December 04, 2023Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 9
Date: December 04, 2023Notice Index # 8
Date: November 08, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 7
Date: November 08, 2023Issuance Index # 4
Date: February 20, 2023Officers Return Index # 5
Date: March 09, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: March 16, 2023Petition Index # 1
Date: February 20, 2023Order Index # 2
Date: February 20, 2023Order Index # 2
Date: December 03, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: January 04, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 10
Date: April 29, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 10
Date: September 16, 2020Issuance Index # 4
Date: June 01, 2020Issuance Index # 4
Date: December 03, 2021Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 11
Date: April 29, 2022Officers Return Index # 5
Date: June 03, 2020Agreed Judgment Index # 9
Date: April 29, 2022Request Index # 3
Date: June 01, 2020Petition Index # 1
Date: May 28, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: June 26, 2020Proposed Order Index # 7
Date: April 21, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 9
Date: September 16, 2020Petition Index # 1
Date: December 03, 2021Officers Return Index # 5
Date: December 22, 2021Agreed Judgment Index # 8
Date: September 16, 2020Order Index # 2
Date: May 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Entry (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rawlins, Monica) BY SUBMISSION | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Defined Contribution Plan) Proposed Order Index # 18 Proposed Order Index # 18Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Defined Contribution Plan) |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Partial Binding Mediated Settlement Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 16 No Fee Documents Index # 16Partial Binding Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediated Settlement Agreement Notice Index # 17 Notice Index # 17Notice of Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Partial Binding Mediated Settlement Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 15 No Fee Documents Index # 15Partial Binding Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | M/Mediation Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rawlins, Monica) ZOOM | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 13 Order Index # 13Standing Temporary Mutual Injunctions Divorce With Children |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 14 No Fee Documents Index # 14Rule 11 Agreement |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance No Fee Documents Index # 12 No Fee Documents Index # 12Entry of Appearance |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Respondent's First Amended Answer Amended Filing Index # 11 Amended Filing Index # 11Respondent's First Amended Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.