Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sugar Land Cubed, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Douglas A Daniels, against The Learning Experience Corp., represented by Sarah-Michelle Stearns, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Tamecia S. Glover presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamecia S. Glover Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 42
Date: August 21, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 43
Date: August 21, 2023Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 40
Date: August 08, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 41
Date: August 21, 2023Notice Index # 39
Date: July 10, 2023Amended Filing Index # 38
Date: February 08, 2023Order Index # 32
Date: August 08, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 35
Date: January 13, 2023Proposed Order Index # 36
Date: January 13, 2023Notice Index # 33
Date: November 07, 2022Notice Index # 34
Date: January 12, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 37
Date: January 17, 2023Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 27
Date: September 15, 2022Motion to Modify Index # 31
Date: October 28, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 29
Date: September 15, 2022Copy Request
Date: September 21, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 28
Date: September 15, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 30
Date: September 15, 2022Proposed Order Index # 22
Date: August 22, 2022Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 26
Date: September 14, 2022Certificate Index # 25
Date: September 12, 2022Notice Index # 20
Date: July 21, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 23
Date: August 23, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 21
Date: August 16, 2022Proposed Order Index # 19
Date: July 18, 2022Proposed Order Index # 18
Date: July 18, 2022Proposed Order Index # 17
Date: July 18, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 16
Date: July 18, 2022Notice Index # 9
Date: June 07, 2022Notice Index # 14
Date: June 27, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 15
Date: July 11, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 8
Date: June 03, 2022Notice Index # 10
Date: June 13, 2022Notice Index # 12
Date: June 21, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 11
Date: June 21, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 13
Date: June 27, 2022Amended Filing Index # 7
Date: January 12, 2022Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Civil Index # 6
Date: July 12, 2021Certificate Index # 5
Date: June 14, 2021Officers Return Index # 4
Date: May 25, 2021Issuance Index # 3
Date: May 11, 2021Request Index # 2
Date: May 11, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: May 11, 2021Request      Index # 2
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 42 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 42 |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 43 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 43 |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 41 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 41 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 40 Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 40Amended Order Granting Defendant The Learning Experience Corp.'s Traditional Motions for Summary Judgment |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Order Index # 32 Order Index # 32Denied. Order of Plaintiff's Motion to Modify |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Docket Entry9/15/2022 Order to be modified ONLY to indicate that the D's Traditional MSJ was granted. D's No Evidence MSJ not granted. The additional contents of the order to remain. tg | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Notice Index # 39 Notice Index # 39Notice of Withdrawal |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Consolidated First Amended Petition and First Amended Original Answer Amended Filing Index # 38 Amended Filing Index # 38Plaintiff's Consolidated First Amended Petition and First Amended Original Answer |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Modify Judgment Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 37 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 37Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Modify Judgment |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | M/Modify (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Glover, Tamecia) Motion to Modify Judgment. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.