Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Erway, Patricia, Gonzales, Brian, Johnson, Maurice F, Lough, Fabiola Iris, Pique, Michelle, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Other Civil case against Eads, Andy Denton County Judge, Edmondson, Dianne Denton County Commissioner, Marchant, Ron Denton County Commissioner, Precinct 2, Mitchell, Bobbie J. Denton County Commissioner, Precinct 3, Phillips, Frank Denton County Elections Administrator, (total of 6) See All represented by Matt Shovlin, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Johnson, James S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: October 20, 2022Filed document
Date: September 06, 2022Answer(s) and/or Response(s)
Date: September 28, 2022Motion
Date: October 20, 2022Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: September 28, 2022Filed document
Date: September 06, 2022Plea to Jurisdiction
Date: September 02, 2022Service Returned
Date: September 06, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 25, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 19, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 18, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 18, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 16, 2022Service Returned
Date: August 17, 2022Request for Issuance of
Date: August 08, 2022Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: August 04, 2022Petition
Date: August 03, 2022Motion
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (will not be signed) The court coordinator or judge has indicated the submitted proposed order will not be signed. The court coordinator or judge has indicated the submitted proposed order will not be signed. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Petitioners' Opposed Motion to take Judicial Notice Denton County Party: Johnson, Maurice F Petitioners' Opposed Motion to take Judicial Notice Denton County |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Petitioners' Opposed Motion to take Judicial Notice Denton County Petitioners' Opposed Motion to take Judicial Notice Denton County |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer(s) and/or Response(s) Petitioner's Response to Respondents' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial, and Motion to Abate Petitioner's Response to Respondents' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial, and Motion to Abate |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (will not be signed) The court coordinator or judge has indicated the submitted proposed order will not be signed. The court coordinator or judge has indicated the submitted proposed order will not be signed. |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filed document - Exhibit A Part 2 of 2 to Denton County Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial and Motion to Abate - Exhibit A Part 2 of 2 to Denton County Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial and Motion to Abate |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filed document - Exhibit A Part 1 of 2 to Denton County Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial and Motion to Abate - Exhibit A Part 1 of 2 to Denton County Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial and Motion to Abate |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Ron Marchant (Duplicate) Party: Marchant, Ron Citation to Ron Marchant (Duplicate) |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plea to Jurisdiction - Denton County Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial and Motion to Abate Party: Eads, Andy Party: Edmondson, Dianne Party: Marchant, Ron Party: Mitchell, Bobbie J. Party: Phillips, Frank Party: Williams, Ryan - Denton County Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction, General Denial and Motion to Abate |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Ron Marchant Party: Marchant, Ron Citation to Ron Marchant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.