Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Adams, Stephanie Marie, Attorney General Of Texas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adams, Kevin James, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 462nd Judicial District Court with Breading, Lee Ann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBreading, Lee Ann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House462nd Judicial District Court |
Original Answer
Date: February 10, 2020Respondent's Original Answer
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: May 27, 2020Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: May 20, 2020Reset Order
Date: February 21, 2020Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: May 29, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: December 20, 2019Motion to Confirm CS Arrearage/or to Reduce Judgment (MRED)
Date: December 20, 2019Motion for Withdrawal/Substitution of Counsel/Attorney
Date: May 24, 2019Motion to Sign
Date: May 13, 2019Counter Petition/Claim
Date: March 27, 2019Order
Date: March 27, 2019Request for Issuance of
Date: September 07, 2018Order
Date: March 27, 2019Transfer Order to the 462nd Judicial District Court
Date: January 22, 2019Respondent's Original Answer
Date: October 02, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: November 27, 2017Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: November 29, 2017Opposition
Date: November 28, 2017Motion to Sign
Date: October 05, 2017Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: November 28, 2017Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: November 27, 2017Order of Referral to Mediation
Date: August 16, 2017Order
Date: July 11, 2017Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: August 31, 2017Mediated (Settlement) Agreement
Date: August 22, 2017Mediator's Report to Court
Date: August 21, 2017Order
Date: June 20, 2017Order
Date: June 20, 2017Letter
Date: July 06, 2017Motion
Date: June 19, 2017Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: May 25, 2017Original Answer
Date: May 31, 2017Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: May 24, 2017Statement of Inability to Afford Pmt of Court Costs
Date: May 24, 2017Motion/Petition for Enforcement
Date: May 24, 2017Order on Motion
Date: May 01, 2017Motion for Continuance
Date: April 28, 2017Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: January 31, 2017Motion for Withdrawal/Substitution of Counsel/Attorney
Date: January 31, 2017Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: January 12, 2017Motion for Further Orders
Date: January 09, 2017Motion
Date: December 27, 2016Order Granting Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Counsel
Date: September 27, 2016Application for Protective Order-DomViol
Date: September 26, 2016Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: September 27, 2016Original Petition for Divorce
Date: August 31, 2016First Amended (Original) Petition
Date: September 22, 2016Counter Petition/Claim
Date: September 01, 2016Original Answer
Date: September 07, 2016Request for Issuance of
Date: August 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Breading, Lee Ann) Set per email from L Hernandez on 6/8/20 Set per email from L Hernandez on 6/8/20 |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Final Trial Of Final Trial |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Adams, Kevin James Party: Adams, Stephanie Marie Party: Adams, Kevin JamesParty: Adams, Stephanie Marie |
|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing) Notice of Nonsuit (Partial) Notice of Nonsuit (Partial) |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OAG: IV-D Hearing Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time CANCELED OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jenkins, Cherami Joann) Pass No Hearing Wanted At This Time Set by the AG |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Reset Order (Judicial Officer: Jenkins, Cherami Joann ) | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
OAG: IV-D Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jenkins, Cherami Joann) Set by the AG Set by the AG |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer to Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Party: Adams, Stephanie Marie to Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Filed by: Adams, Kevin James Filed by: Adams, Kevin James |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Party: Adams, Stephanie Marie Party: Adams, Stephanie Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.