Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Schieszer, David A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schieszer, Kerrie, represented by Chad D. Elsey, Donna R. Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 158th Judicial District Court with Burgess, Steve presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBurgess, Steve Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House158th Judicial District Court |
Record/Copy Request
Date: September 26, 2019Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: March 04, 2019Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: March 04, 2019Proposed Order (will not be signed)
Date: February 27, 2019Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: December 03, 2018Subpoena(s) issued by attorney
Date: December 03, 2018Respondent's Original Answer
Date: August 03, 2018Motion/Petition To Modify
Date: June 04, 2018Request for Issuance of
Date: June 04, 2018Order on Motion
Date: July 11, 2018Record/Copy Request
Date: May 10, 2018Motion
Date: May 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination of Assignment & Child Support Services | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Elsey, Chad D. Party: Elsey, Chad D. |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Agreed Order Modifying Alimony for Parties: Schieszer, David A. for Parties: Schieszer, Kerrie Agreed Order Modifying Alimony |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (will not be signed) The court coordinator or judge has indicated the submitted proposed order will not be signed. The court coordinator or judge has indicated the submitted proposed order will not be signed. |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Burgess, Steve) Announced Settled - Disposition order required in 30 days Set via email on 9/18/18. 2 hours or less requested. |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Document(s) Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena(s) issued by attorney for Morris Salerno Subpoena(s) issued by attorney for Morris Salerno Party: Schieszer, David A. |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena(s) issued by attorney for Alex Schieszer Subpoena(s) issued by attorney for Alex Schieszer Party: Schieszer, David A. |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Requests to David A. Schieszer Party: Schieszer, Kerrie Requests to David A. Schieszer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.