Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Davis, Joshua J., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hymes, William Edward, against Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Hardwick, Justin W., represented by Hollins, Joycell Marie, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 21, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2023ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT
Date: September 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 29, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 04, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: September 25, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 01, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 06, 2023Scheduling Conference
Date: October 20, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 12, 2024Plea to Jurisdiction
Date: November 09, 2023Plea to Jurisdiction
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
162nd JURY TRIAL SET LETTER Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 11, 2024 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER/ PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION & MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL Plea to Jurisdiction CRYSTAL LEAL (214-906-7296) 15MIN DEF/PLEA TO JURISDICTION FILED AS AN ANSWER ON 9/1/23 **IN PERSON HEARING** |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON DEF (DART) PARTIAL PLEA TO JURISDICTION Plea to Jurisdiction RE-SET W/ CRYSTAL LEAL (214-906-7296) 15MIN DEF/PLEA TO JURISDICTION FILED AS AN ANSWER ON 9/1/23 **IN PERSON HEARING** |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd SCHEDULING CONF HEARING NOTICE Scheduling Conference |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DEF/PLEA TO JURISDICTION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER AGREED LEVEL 2 |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON DEF (DART) PARTIAL PLEA TO JURISDICTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE, FILING AND INTENT TO USE DISCOVERY |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER PARTIAL NONSUIT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE E-SERVE ORDER PARTIAL NONSUIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.