Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Wood, Charles David, Jr, Wood, Lola Bridgette, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reid, William E, against Builders First Source Dallas, Llc, Ridgeview Timberworks, Llc, Sawmill Partners Llc, represented by Mclin, Ian M, Norris, Ciera, Senter, Mark S, Tribble, Wesson H, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2023 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
RESPONSE
Date: January 23, 2024AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 15, 2024AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 23, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 29, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2024RESPONSE
Date: January 23, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2024MOTION - STRIKE
Date: February 13, 2024DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: January 30, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 29, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 14, 2023SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: June 23, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 10, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 05, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: August 24, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 22, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: August 04, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 31, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 26, 2023OBJECTION
Date: June 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 25, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: April 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2024Motion - Compel
Date: January 24, 2024ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 27, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 27, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: January 16, 2024Motion - Compel
Date: December 15, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 07, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 29, 2024ORDER - COMPEL
Date: August 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2024MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 25, 2023SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: June 23, 2023RULE 11
Date: December 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 19, 2023Special Exceptions
Date: July 28, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 25, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 16, 2024AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 21, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 24, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 17, 2023SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: June 23, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 20, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 16, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 02, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 25, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 14, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 24, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 20, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 10, 2024AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 17, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: August 31, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: June 29, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 16, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 03, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 25, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: June 26, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 20, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 27, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: January 23, 2024RESPONSE
Date: August 22, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 31, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 14, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 18, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 02, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 26, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: December 15, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 06, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - RONALD RICHARD WOODWARD CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RONALD RICHARD WOODWARD |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
BFS TEXAS SALES LLC 6TH AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL 6TH |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLTF MOTION TO STRIKE BFS TEXAS SALES LLC 5TH AMENDED ANSWER MOTION - STRIKE BFS TEXAS SALES LLC 5TH AMENDED ANSWER |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ANDRIA LAI |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - DANIEL ZIPPERLEN CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DANIEL ZIPPERLEN |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION CHARLES DAVID WOOD |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEF DESIGNATION OF EXPERT DESIGNATION DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) DEFENDANTS |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - BUBBA FINNELL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BUBBA FINNELL |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON 2ND MOTION TO COMPEL Motion - Compel 30 MINS - P/2ND COMPEL DISC RESP FROM DEF BFS - CHANDRA 214 618 0131 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.