Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Duerer, Brenda Mosier, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carver, Christopher Todd, against Carter, Marty Lee, Orbital Power Inc, represented by Nelson, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: February 10, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 11, 2023MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 28, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 10, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 08, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 14, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: May 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: August 29, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 22, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: September 15, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 28, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: September 22, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 20, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 25, 2023Scheduling Conference
Date: March 28, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: September 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION MARTY LEE CARTER |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH Motion - Compel SET BY KATY 979-846-8686 - 30M - IN PERSON - C.C REQ |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-SERVE ORDER CLOSING CASE MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER ORDER CLOSING CASE |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY & AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY & AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON DEF MOTION TO QUASH CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON DEF MOTION TO QUASH |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED/ ON MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH MOTION - QUASH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.