Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Hill, Ashley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Byrd, Theresa, Du, Thompson, King, Kursten Brooke, Reaves, Jon M., Esq, against Manley, Brenden James, represented by Kent, Jarad L., Shim, John, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 07, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 03, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 03, 2022Motion - Exclude
Date: March 30, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 26, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 08, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 01, 2023DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 06, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: June 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 04, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 02, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 08, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 15, 2024WITNESS LIST
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 15, 2024PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 15, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 12, 2024WITNESS LIST
Date: March 11, 2024PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 11, 2024DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 11, 2024MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 11, 2024MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 03, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 13, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 14, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: August 23, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2023MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: March 02, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 06, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 27, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 01, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 10, 2022CROSS CLAIM
Date: February 07, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: March 01, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 18, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 18, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 13, 2023Motion - Exclude
Date: March 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil SPECIAL SET / 3 days |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL HEARING 2 HRS |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLTF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER E-SERVE COVER LETTER ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil SPECIAL SET / 3 days |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR AGREED SPECIAL SETTING ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS'PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANTS' |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.