Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tinsman, Divya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greco, Shelly, Provost, Christopher K, against Couch, Thomas, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Balido, Carlos A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
This is an original petition filed in the 298th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiff, Divya Tinsman, is suing State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Thomas Couch for benefits due under an insurance policy and for...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 14, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 14, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 10, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 14, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 24, 2022MOTION - SEVER
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 22, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 05, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 16, 2022Motion - Leave
Date: January 13, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 13, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 27, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: October 14, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 15, 2023Motion - Quash
Date: February 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 23, 2023RESPONSE
Date: March 21, 2023Motion - Quash
Date: May 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 23, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 23, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 27, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2023ORDER - SEVER
Date: March 30, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 13, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: August 14, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: May 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
30 DAY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 7-10-23) |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO DIVYA TINSMAN CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DIVYA TINSMAN |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LETTER FROM MEDIATOR CASE SETTLED |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH Motion - Quash SET BY PLAINTIFF ** VIA ZOOM ** |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CC RECEIVED FOR MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ON MAY 25, 2023 @ 9:30 AM |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFT'S M/QUASH & M/PROTECTIVE ORDER MOTION - QUASH AND MOTION PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION TO QUASH |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.