Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Simpson, Renee, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Davis, Arnesia B, against Trh Legacy Group, Llc., represented by Whitehurst, David Walton, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is an Original Petition and Request for Disclosure filed by Renee Simpson against TRH Legacy Group, LLC. Simpson is an individual resident of Dallas County, Texas, and TRH Legacy Group, LLC. may be served through its registered agent of service,...
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 09, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 13, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 09, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 06, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 06, 2021MOTION - RETAIN
Date: October 14, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2021CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: October 14, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: November 10, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 06, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 27, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 05, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 15, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 29, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: December 06, 2021CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: March 31, 2022ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: April 07, 2022MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: March 02, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 30, 2022MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 18, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: December 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 29, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: August 22, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 17, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 15, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 31, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: September 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2022ORDER - PROTECT
Date: September 16, 2022RESPONSE
Date: September 12, 2022MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: October 11, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: September 12, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: September 12, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: September 22, 2022RESPONSE
Date: October 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 24, 2022MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: October 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RENEE SIMPSON |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED MOTION NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL 1ST AMENDED |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - New Trial 15 MIN RENEE SIMPSON 972-415-4427 (hearing held, ruling issued) |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - New Trial 15 MIN RENEE SIMPSON 972-415-4427 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION NEW TRIAL RESPONSE TO MOTION NEW TRIAL |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY MOTION NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DENY MOTION NEW TRIAL |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.