Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velasquez, Dariona, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Vaught, Allen R, against Cohen-Esrey Communities Llc, represented by Ramon, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryEmployment |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 28, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 06, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 03, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 02, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 02, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: May 09, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: December 16, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 19, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 29, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 30, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 3RD RESET ON DWOP - CASE SETTLED MLD NTCS TO ALL PARITES |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO DANIEL RAMON NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED ORDER ON COUNSEL'S LEGAL FEES TO CLERKS |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED ORDER ON FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT TO CLERKS |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD ORDER ON COUNSEL LEGAL FEES TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD FINAL JDGMNT TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ON JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT Notice of Hearing on Joint Motion for Final Approval of Collective Action and Class Action Settlement and Plaintiff's and Class Counsel's Unopposed Motion for Class Counsel Legal Fees and Costs |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT MOTION - MISCELLANOUS JOINT FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.