We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Metrocity Holdings, Llc Vs. Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Metrocity Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Gilbert, J. Scott, against Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.

Case Details for Metrocity Holdings, Llc v. Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc

Judge

SMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

January 19, 2021

Category

Other (Civil)

Last Refreshed

December 09, 2023

Filing Location

Dallas County, TX

Filing Court House

192nd District Court

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for Metrocity Holdings, Llc v. Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc

Plaintiffs

Metrocity Holdings, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Gilbert, J. Scott

Defendants

Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc

Case Documents for Metrocity Holdings, Llc v. Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc

ORIGINAL PETITION

Date: January 19, 2021

ORDER - PROTECT

Date: March 23, 2021

MOTION HEARING

Date: February 23, 2021

Case Events for Metrocity Holdings, Llc v. Wright Brothers Aircraft Title, Inc

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER - PROTECT
Docket Event NOTE - CLERKS
RULE 202 ORDER TO PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT AND MOVANT
Docket Event NOTICE RE: 202 HEARING
MOTION HEARING
1 HOUR RULE 202 ROXANNE 601-965-1992 ZOOM Zoom Meeting ID: 912 4686 8461 sent login 2/15
Docket Event NOTICE RE: 202 HEARING
MISCELLANOUS EVENT
RE: 202 HEARING
Docket Event EXECUTED NOTICE OF HEARING:DEBBIE MERCER ERWIN
RETURN OF SERVICE
Docket Event EXECUTED NOTICE OF HEARING: WRIGHT BROTHERS AIRCRAFT ITILE, INC.
RETURN OF SERVICE
Docket Event EXECUTED NOTICE OF HEARING: KAYLEIGH MOFFETT
RETURN OF SERVICE
Docket Event NOTICE OF HEARING 02/23/2021 10:15 RULE 202
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
02/23/2021 10:15 RULE 202
Docket Event NOTICE OF HEARING 02/23/2021 RULE 202
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
02/23/2021 RULE 202
Docket Event NOTICE OF HEARING 02/23/21 10:15 RULE 202
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
02/23/21 10:15 RULE 202
See all events